blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0807940


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
21.11.2008 Change - lapse in a contracting state published on  24.12.2008  [2008/52]
02.05.2008 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.06.2008  [2008/23]
23.11.2007 No opposition filed within time limit published on  26.12.2007  [2007/52]
15.12.2006 (Expected) grant published on  17.01.2007  [2007/03]
08.12.2006 New entry: Renewal fee paid
08.09.2006 Change - applicant published on  11.10.2006  [2006/41]
05.09.2006 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
05.09.2006 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
12.05.2006 Change - classification published on  14.06.2006  [2006/24]
12.05.2006 Change - classification published on  14.06.2006  [2006/24]
12.04.2006 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
25.03.2006 New entry: Reply to examination report
15.12.2005 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
09.12.2005 New entry: Renewal fee paid
10.12.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
10.12.2003 New entry: Renewal fee paid
29.11.2003 New entry: Reply to examination report
03.10.2003 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
17.05.2003 Examination report or reply
11.12.2002 Renewal fee
06.03.2002 Examination report or reply
14.01.2002 Examination report or reply
07.12.2001 Renewal fee
31.08.2001 First examination report
27.08.2001 Examination report or reply
07.12.2000 Renewal fee
07.12.1999 Renewal fee
03.12.1999 Supplementary search report published on  19.01.2000 [2000/03]
03.12.1999 Change - classification published on  19.01.2000 [2000/03]
08.12.1998 Renewal fee
06.02.1998 Change - PCT data published on  25.03.1998 [1998/13]
12.12.1997 Request for examination filed published on  28.01.1998 [1998/05]
24.10.1997 Change - German title published on  10.12.1997 [1997/50]
03.10.1997 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  19.11.1997 [1997/47]
09.09.1997 PCT data prior to European publication
13.08.1997 PCT data prior to European publication
05.08.1997 PCT data prior to European publication
22.07.1997 PCT data prior to European publication
03.01.1997 PCT data prior to European publication