blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0807940
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6816047Global Dossier 09.11.2004B2
US2003155998 21.08.2003A1
Priority number Date
JP9603512 29.11.1996
JP33602395 30.11.1995
US89526997 16.07.1997
US39128403 18.03.2003
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP0807940Global Dossier 17.01.2007B1
EP0807940 19.01.2000A4
EP0807940 19.11.1997A1
Priority number Date
JP9603512 29.11.1996
JP33602395 30.11.1995
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE69636849D 08.03.2007D1
Priority number Date
JP9603512 29.11.1996
JP33602395 30.11.1995
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE69636849T 08.11.2007T2
Priority number Date
JP9603512 29.11.1996
JP33602395 30.11.1995
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6580346 17.06.2003B1
Priority number Date
JP9603512 29.11.1996
JP33602395 30.11.1995
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO9720326Global Dossier 05.06.1997A1
Priority number Date
JP33602395 30.11.1995
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP3731231BGlobal Dossier 05.01.2006B2
JPH09153408 10.06.1997A
Priority number Date
JP33602395 30.11.1995