blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP0807940

Designated contracting states DE 
 FRLapse: 17.01.2007
 GB 
 ITLapse: 17.01.2007
Examination procedure25.08.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Entry into regional phase15.07.1997Translation filed 
29.08.1997National basic fee paid 
29.08.1997Search fee paid 
29.08.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
04.12.1997Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
26.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
29.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
29.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
29.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
28.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 08
30.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 09
30.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 10
30.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 11
European patent granted17.01.2007
Opposition procedure18.10.2007No opposition filed within time limit published on 26.12.2007 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:19.11.1997 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):DE FR GB IT
 
Event date:28.01.1998 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:19971204
 
Event date:25.03.1998 
Event description:DEFERRED SEARCH REPORT PUBLISHED (DELETED)
 
Event date:19.01.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A4
Designated State(s):DE FR GB IT
 
Event date:19.01.2000 
Event description:SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT DRAWN UP AND DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:19991206
 
Event date:19.01.2000 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
Free Format Text:7H 01F 7/22 A, 7G 01R 33/38 B, 7G 01R 33/3815 B, 7G 01R 33/421 B, 7G 01R 33/3875 B
 
Event date:17.10.2001 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20010830
 
Event date:14.06.2006 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:H01F 6/06 20060101AFI20060418BHEP
 
Event date:14.06.2006 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:G01R 33/38 20060101ALI20060418BHEP
 
Event date:14.06.2006 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:G01R 33/3815 20060101ALI20060418BHEP
 
Event date:14.06.2006 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:G01R 33/421 20060101ALI20060418BHEP
 
Event date:14.06.2006 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:G01R 33/3875 20060101ALI20060418BHEP
 
Event date:14.06.2006 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:G01N 24/08 20060101ALI20060418BHEP
 
Event date:11.10.2006 
Event description:RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED
Owner Name:HITACHI MEDICAL CORPORATION
 
Event date:17.01.2007 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):DE FR GB IT
 
Event date:17.01.2007 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED
 
Event date:08.03.2007 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:69636849
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20070308
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Event date:26.12.2007 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED
Effective DATE:20071018
 
Event date:30.04.2008 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20070907
 
Event date:30.04.2008 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20070117
 
Event date:28.11.2008 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20070117
 
Event date:31.03.2011 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20101022
Year of Fee Payment:15
 
Event date:31.05.2012 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20111130
Year of Fee Payment:16
 
Event date:24.07.2013 
Event description:GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE
Effective DATE:20121129
 
Event date:12.09.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R119 69636849 DE
Code Expl.:-APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE
Effective DATE:20130601
 
Event date:31.10.2013 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20130601
 
Event date:29.11.2013 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20121129