Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0807940

EP0807940 - SUPERCONDUCTING MAGNET DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.11.2007
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.11.2008Change - lapse in a contracting state
Updated state(s): FR
published on 24.12.2008  [2008/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HITACHI MEDICAL CORPORATION
1-14, Uchi-kanda, 1-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 101 / JP
[2006/41]
Former [1997/47]For all designated states
HITACHI MEDICAL CORPORATION
1-4, 1-chome, Uchikanda Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 101 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / TAKESHIMA, Hirotaka Hitachi Medical Corporation
1-14, Uchi-kanda 1-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 101 / JP
02 / KAWANO, Hajime Hitachi Medical Corporation
1-14, Uchi-kanda 1-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 101 / JP
03 / KAKUGAWA, Shigeru
3-17-2-206, Moriyama-cho Hitachi-shi
Ibaraki-ken 316 / JP
04 / HINO, Noriaki
1433-11, Miwa 3-chome
Mito-shi Ibaraki-ken 310 / JP
[1997/47]
Representative(s)Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Grillparzerstrasse 14
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1997/47]Viering, Jentschura & Partner
Postfach 22 14 43
80504 München / DE
Application number, filing date96939331.329.11.1996
[1997/47]
WO1996JP03512
Priority number, dateJP1995033602330.11.1995         Original published format: JP 33602395
[1997/47]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9720326
Date:05.06.1997
[1997/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0807940
Date:19.11.1997
Language:EN
[1997/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0807940
Date:17.01.2007
Language:EN
[2007/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP24.12.1997
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:H01F6/06, G01R33/38, G01R33/3815, G01R33/421, G01R33/3875, G01N24/08
[2006/24]
Former International [2000/03]H01F7/22, G01R33/38, G01R33/3815, G01R33/421, G01R33/3875
Former International [1997/47]H01F7/22
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1997/47]
TitleGerman:SUPRALEITENDE MAGNETVORRICHTUNG[1997/50]
English:SUPERCONDUCTING MAGNET DEVICE[1997/47]
French:DISPOSITIF A AIMANT SUPRACONDUCTEUR[1997/47]
Former [1997/47]SUPRALEITENDE MAGNETEINRICHTUNG
Entry into regional phase15.07.1997Translation filed 
29.08.1997National basic fee paid 
29.08.1997Search fee paid 
29.08.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
04.12.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.12.1997Examination requested  [1998/05]
30.08.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.02.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.05.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.11.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.12.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03)
20.03.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.04.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.08.2006Fee for grant paid
25.08.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)18.10.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
26.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
29.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
29.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
29.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
28.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 08
30.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 09
30.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 10
30.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 11
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR17.01.2007
IT17.01.2007
[2008/52]
Former [2008/23]IT17.01.2007
FR07.09.2007
Documents cited:Search[X]US5448214  (LASKARIS EVANGELOS T) [X] 1,2,7 * column 2, line 57 - column 6, line 20; figures 1,2 *;
 [X]US5382904  (PISSANETZKY SERGIO) [X] 1,2,5,7 * column 24, line 8 - column 25, line 31; figures 13,17,18 *;
 [X]GB2289343  (BRUKER ANALYTISCHE MESSTECHNIK) [X] 1,2,5,7 * page 11, line 12 - page 14, line 20 * * page 16, line 14 - page 17, line 22; figures 2,4 *;
 [AD]US5410287  (LASKARIS EVANGELOS T ET AL) [AD] 1-7 * column 3, line 54 - column 7, line 27; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US4766378  (DANBY GORDON T ET AL) [A] 6 * column 5, line 62 - column 6, line 7 * * column 7, line 48 - column 9, line 30; figure 2 *
International search[A]JPS61125109  ;
 [A]JPS60142506