Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0914618

EP0914618 - INTEGRITY MONITORING METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR GPS AND DGPS RECEIVERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.03.2002
Database last updated on 13.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip22.03.2002No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 08.05.2002  [2002/19]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HONEYWELL INC.
Honeywell Plaza
Minneapolis, MN 55408 / US
[N/P]
Former [1999/19]For all designated states
HONEYWELL INC.
Honeywell Plaza
Minneapolis Minnesota 55408 / US
Inventor(s)01 / STANGELAND, Rodney, L.
10010 31st Avenue North
Plymouth, MN 55441 / US
02 / ADAMS, Wayland, K.
7722 West John Cabot Road
Glendale, AZ 85308 / US
[1999/19]
Representative(s)Sturm, Christoph , et al
Honeywell Holding AG
IP Europe - Law Department
Kaiserleistrasse 39
63067 Offenbach am Main / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/22]Sturm, Christoph , et al
Honeywell Holding AG, IP Europe Law Dept., Kaiserleistrasse 39
63067 Offenbach am Main / DE
Former [1999/19]Herzbach, Dieter, Dipl.-Ing.
Honeywell Holding AG, Patent- und Lizenzabteilung, Kaiserleistrasse 39
63067 Offenbach am Main / DE
Application number, filing date96939435.225.07.1996
[1999/19]
WO1996US12236
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9804929
Date:05.02.1998
Language:EN
[1998/05]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0914618
Date:12.05.1999
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.02.1998
[1999/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0914618
Date:16.05.2001
Language:EN
[2001/20]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP05.02.1998
ClassificationInternational:G01S1/02
[1999/19]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1999/19]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG DER INTEGRITÄT UND GERÄT FÜR GPS- UND DGPS-EMPFÄNGER[1999/19]
English:INTEGRITY MONITORING METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR GPS AND DGPS RECEIVERS[1999/19]
French:PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE SURVEILLANCE DE L'INTEGRITE DESTINES A DES RECEPTEURS GPS ET DGPS[1999/19]
Entry into regional phase13.02.1999National basic fee paid 
13.02.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
13.02.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.02.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
03.02.1999Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.02.1999Examination requested  [1999/19]
20.10.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
31.10.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.11.2000Fee for grant paid
09.11.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.02.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.06.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
02.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
10.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[Y]US5461388  (APPLEGATE JOHN D [US], et al) [Y] 1-5 * column 3, line 10 - line 26; figure 2 *;
 [Y]WO9410582  (HONEYWELL INC [US]) [Y] 1-5 * page 4, line 4 - page 7, line 26; figure 2 *;
 [A]WO9606363  (HONEYWELL INC [US]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *