Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0859893

EP0859893 - VERSATILE MODULAR OFFICE PARTITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  19.10.2001
Database last updated on 21.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2001Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 05.12.2001 [2001/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Finish Group Ltd.
48 Deshanim Street
28102 Kiryat Ata / IL
[1998/35]
Inventor(s)01 / RAZ, Dan
52 Habikurim Street
34577 Haifa / IL
02 / KONIK, Anatoly
10 Melchet Street
33143 Haifa / IL
[1998/35]
Representative(s)Lee, Nicholas John
Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn
London WC1V 7JH / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/35]Lee, Nicholas John
Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway
London WC2B 6UD / GB
Application number, filing date96939619.105.11.1996
[1998/35]
WO1996US17994
Priority number, dateUS1995055391206.11.1995         Original published format: US 553912
[1998/35]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9717507
Date:15.05.1997
Language:EN
[1997/21]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0859893
Date:26.08.1998
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.05.1997
[1998/35]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US15.05.1997
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.06.2000
ClassificationInternational:E04B2/74, E04B2/76, A47B21/00, A47B83/00, H02G3/28
[2000/31]
Former International [1998/35]E04B2/74, E04B2/76
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT,   NL [1998/35]
TitleGerman:ANPASSBARE MODULARE BÜROTRENNWÄNDE[1998/35]
English:VERSATILE MODULAR OFFICE PARTITIONS[1998/35]
French:CLOISONS MODULAIRES DE BUREAU ADAPTABLES[1998/35]
Entry into regional phase04.07.1997National basic fee paid 
04.07.1997Search fee paid 
04.07.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
04.07.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.05.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
04.07.1997Examination requested  [1998/35]
01.06.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2001/49]
03.07.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2001/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
22.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200005   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search   [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[X]US5219406  ;
 [A]US5207041  ;
 [A]US5081808  ;
 [Y]US4905428  ;
 [A]US4874027  ;
 [A]US4597140