Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0864165

EP0864165 - HIGH ISOLATION POWER TRANSFORMER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.06.2001
Database last updated on 20.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip23.11.2001Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 09.01.2002  [2002/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Metron Designs Ltd.
The Old Rectory Alderford
Norwich NR9 5NF / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/38]For all designated states
Metron Designs Ltd.
The Old Rectory
Alderford, Norwich NR9 5NF / GB
Inventor(s)01 / PICKERING, John Robert
The Old Rectory
Alderford, Norwich NR9 5NF / GB
[1998/38]
Representative(s)Bubb, Antony John Allen , et al
Wilson Gunn Chancery House, Chancery Lane
London WC2A 1QU / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/38]Bubb, Antony John Allen , et al
GEE & CO. Chancery House Chancery Lane
London WC2A 1QU / GB
Application number, filing date96940047.202.12.1996
[1998/38]
WO1996GB02976
Priority number, dateGB1995002456601.12.1995         Original published format: GB 9524566
[1998/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9721233
Date:12.06.1997
Language:EN
[1997/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0864165
Date:16.09.1998
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.06.1997
[1998/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0864165
Date:02.08.2000
Language:EN
[2000/31]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.06.1997
ClassificationInternational:H01F30/16, H01F27/34
[1998/38]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   LI [1998/38]
TitleGerman:LEISTUNGSTRANSFORMATOR HOHER ISOLATION[1998/38]
English:HIGH ISOLATION POWER TRANSFORMER[1998/38]
French:TRANSFORMATEUR DE PUISSANCE A FORTE ISOLATION[1998/38]
Entry into regional phase26.06.1998National basic fee paid 
26.06.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
26.06.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.07.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
26.06.1998Examination requested  [1998/38]
12.11.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.03.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.07.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
04.02.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.04.2000Fee for grant paid
25.04.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.05.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.12.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
26.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCH02.08.2000
LI02.08.2000
[2002/02]
Cited inInternational search[A]DE2529296  (FERRANTI LTD);
 [A]US3264592  (PEARSON PAUL A);
 [A]DE848368  (FELTEN & GUILLEAUME CARLSWERK)
ExaminationDE4412957