Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0859644

EP0859644 - URETERAL STENT WITH SMALL BLADDER TAIL(S) [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.02.2008
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.09.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE
published on 22.10.2008  [2008/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Boston Scientific Limited
Financial Services Centre P.O. Box 111, Bishop's Court Hill
St. Michael / BB
[2007/17]
Former [1999/21]For all designated states
Boston Scientific Limited
Financial Services Centre, P.O. Box 111, Bishop's Court Hill
St. Michael, Barbados / BB
Former [1998/35]For all designated states
BOSTON SCIENTIFIC CORPORATION
One Boston Scientific Place
Natick, MA 01760-1537 / US
Inventor(s)01 / CLAYMAN, Ralph V., Boston Scientific Corp.
One Boston Scientific Place
Natick, MA 01760-1537 / US
02 / DASSA, Alyssa J., Boston Scientific Corp.
One Boston Scientific Place
Natick, MA 01760-1537 / US
03 / FISHBEIN, Christopher, Boston Scientific Corp.
One Boston Scientific Place
Natick, MA 01760-1537 / US
04 / GODSHALL, Douglas E., Boston Scientific Corp.
One Boston Scientific Place
Natick, MA 01760-1537 / US
05 / WHITMORE, Willet F. III, Boston Scientific Corp.
One Boston Scientific Place
Natick, MA 01760-1537 / US
 [2006/49]
Former [1998/35]01 / CLAYMAN, Ralph V., Boston Scientific Corp.
One Boston Scientific Place
Natick, MA 01760-1537 / US
02 / DASSA, Alyssa J., Boston Scientific Corp.
One Boston Scientific Place
Natick, MA 01760-1537 / US
03 / FISHBEIN, Christopher, Boston Scientific Corp.
One Boston Scientific Place
Natick, MA 01760-1537 7 / US
04 / GODSHALL, Douglas E., Boston Scientific Corp.
One Boston Scientific Place
Natick, MA 01760-1537 / US
05 / WHITMORE, Willet F. III, Boston Scientific Corp.
One Boston Scientific Place
Natick, MA 01760-1537 / US
Representative(s)Lawrence, John
Barker Brettell LLP
100 Hagley Road
Edgbaston
Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/35]Lawrence, John
Barker Brettell 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston
Birmingham B16 9PW / GB
Application number, filing date96940309.606.11.1996
[1998/35]
WO1996US17795
Priority number, dateUS19950006259P07.11.1995         Original published format: US 6259 P
US19960025284P19.09.1996         Original published format: US 25284 P
[1998/35]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9717094
Date:15.05.1997
Language:EN
[1997/21]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0859644
Date:26.08.1998
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.05.1997
[1998/35]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0859644
Date:25.04.2007
Language:EN
[2007/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US15.05.1997
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:A61M5/00, A61F2/06
[2000/19]
Former International [1998/35]A61M5/00
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   DK,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT,   NL [1998/35]
TitleGerman:HARNRÖHREN-STENT MIT KLEINEN HARNBLASENENDEN[1998/35]
English:URETERAL STENT WITH SMALL BLADDER TAIL(S)[1998/35]
French:EXTENSEUR URETERAL POURVU DE PETITE(S) QUEUE(S) POUR VESSIE[1998/35]
Entry into regional phase05.06.1998National basic fee paid 
05.06.1998Search fee paid 
05.06.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
05.06.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.06.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
05.06.1998Examination requested  [1998/35]
20.12.2002Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.02.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.06.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.11.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.03.2007Fee for grant paid
05.03.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP07004925.9  / EP1792636
EP10184665.7  / EP2308527
Opposition(s)28.01.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.10.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
04.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
10.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
07.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
07.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
07.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 08
08.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 09
07.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 10
06.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 11
Lapses during opposition  TooltipDK25.04.2007
FI25.04.2007
IT06.11.2007
BE30.11.2007
[2008/43]
Former [2008/23]DK25.04.2007
FI25.04.2007
IT06.11.2007
Former [2008/08]DK25.04.2007
FI25.04.2007
Former [2008/06]FI25.04.2007
Documents cited:Search[X]DE4103573  (HUEBNER WILHELM ALEXANDER DR [AT]) [X] 1-5,7-9,13,16-22,24,25,27,30,40 * column 1, line 27 - column 3, line 31 * * figure -; claim - *;
 [X]DE3517813  (WIEDECK JOERG GUENTER DR MED) [X] 1-5,7-9,13,14,16-22,24,25,27,29,30,36-38,40 * the whole document *;
 [X]DE3740288  (REUTER HANS JOACHIM) [X] 1,2,4-11,15-18 * column 3, line 37 - column 4, line 33 * * figures 1,3-6; claims 1-20 *;
 [X]DE4134030  (ANGIOMED AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,5,16,36 * figure -; claim - *;
 [A]EP0326908  (BRAUN MELSUNGEN AG [DE]) [A] 1-38,40 * figure -; claim - *;
 [A]US4307723  (FINNEY ROY P) [A] 1-38,40 * figure -; claim - *
International search[X]US4671795  (MULCHIN WILLIAM L [US]);
 [A]US4913683  (GREGORY FRANKLIN P [US])
by applicantUS4531933