Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0863844

EP0863844 - ZEOLITE SSZ-44 [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.07.2001
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.07.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 05.09.2001 [2001/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Chevron Chemical Company LLC
2613 Camino Ramon
San Ramon, CA 94583-4289 / US
[2000/34]
Former [1999/31]For all designated states
Chevron Chemical Company LLC
575 Market Street
San Francisco, CA 94105 / US
Former [1998/38]For all designated states
CHEVRON U.S.A. INC.
575 Market Street
San Francisco, CA 94105 / US
Inventor(s)01 / YUMI, Nakagawa
6435 Swainland Road
Oakland, CA 94611 / US
[1998/38]
Representative(s)Nash, David Allan , et al
Haseltine Lake LLP
Redcliff Quay
120 Redcliff Street
Bristol BS1 6HU / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/38]Nash, David Allan , et al
Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway
London WC2B 6UD / GB
Application number, filing date96940545.519.11.1996
[1998/38]
WO1996US18588
Priority number, dateUS1995056620101.12.1995         Original published format: US 566201
[1998/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9720769
Date:12.06.1997
Language:EN
[1997/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0863844
Date:16.09.1998
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.06.1997
[1998/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0863844
Date:13.09.2000
Language:EN
[2000/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.06.1997
ClassificationInternational:C01B39/48, B01J29/04
[1998/38]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1998/38]
TitleGerman:ZEOLITE SSZ-44[1998/38]
English:ZEOLITE SSZ-44[1998/38]
French:ZEOLITE SSZ-44[1998/38]
Entry into regional phase25.06.1998National basic fee paid 
25.06.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
25.06.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.06.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
25.06.1998Examination requested  [1998/38]
16.09.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.12.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.06.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.08.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.11.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
16.03.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.05.2000Fee for grant paid
30.05.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.06.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
08.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[AP]WO9634827  (CHEVRON USA INC [US]) [AP] 1 * claim 1 *;
 [A]EP0102497  (RES ASS PETROLEUM ALTERNAT DEV [JP]) [A] 1 * claims 1,2 *;
 [A]WO9507859  (DAVIS MARK E [US], et al) [A] 1 * claim 1; table 1 *;
 [A]EP0021445  (MONTEDISON SPA [IT]) [A] 17 * claim 1 *;
 [A]WO9509812  (CHEVRON USA INC [US]) [A] 1 * claim 1 *