Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0874805

EP0874805 - PHENYLACETAMIDE DERIVATIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.07.2001
Database last updated on 15.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip11.01.2003Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): NL
published on 26.02.2003  [2003/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KOREA RESEARCH INSTITUTE OF CHEMICAL TECHNOLOGY
No. 100, Jang-dong, Yuseong-gu
Daejeon 305-343 / KR
[N/P]
Former [1998/45]For all designated states
Korea Research Institute of Chemical Technology
100, Jang-dong, Yuseong-gu
Daejeon 305-343 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / PARK, No Sang
383-16, Doryong-dong, Yuseong-gu
Daejeon 305-340 / KR
02 / JUNG, Young Sik
Kongdong Apartment 8-505, 431, Doryong-dong
Yuseong-gu, Daejeon 305-340 / KR
03 / SEONG, Churl Min
Kongdong Apartment 8-301, 431, Doryong-dong
Yuseong-gu, Daejeon 305-340 / KR
04 / CHOI, Seung Won
1-73, Jeonnong-3-dong
Dongdaemoon-gu, Seoul 130-023 / KR
05 / CHOI, Yeon Joo
Hwangsil Town Apartment 113-1202, Walpyung-dong
Seo-gu, Daejeon 302-280 / KR
06 / LEE, Jong Cheol
Hanbit Apartment 120-1403, 99, Eoeun-dong
Yuseong-gu, Daejeon 305-333 / KR
07 / CHOI, Jin Il
Hanbit Apartment 118-201, 99, Eoeun-dong
Yuseong-gu, Daejeon 305-333 / KR
08 / LEE, Kwang Sook
Hangaram Apartment 3-1508, 834, Tanbang-dong
Seo-gu, Daejeon 302-223 / KR
09 / KONG, Jae Yang
Cheonggu Narae Apt. 107-605, 462-4, Jeonmin-dong
Yuseong-gu, Daejeon 305-390 / KR
10 / LEE, Bu Yeon
Hanbit Apartment 126-603, 99, Eoeun-dong
Yuseong-gu, Daejeon 305-333 / KR
11 / KIM, Jae Hong
Hanbit Apartment 126-703, 99, Eoeun-dong
Yuseong-gu, Daejeon 305-333 / KR
[1998/45]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/45]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date96940732.911.12.1996
[1998/45]
WO1996KR00239
Priority number, dateKR1995004861712.12.1995         Original published format: KR 9548617
[1998/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9721668
Date:19.06.1997
Language:EN
[1997/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0874805
Date:04.11.1998
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.06.1997
[1998/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0874805
Date:20.09.2000
Language:EN
[2000/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:AT19.06.1997
ClassificationInternational:C07C235/34, C07C323/25, A61K31/165
[1998/45]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [2000/37]
Former [1998/45]CH,  DE,  ES,  FR,  GB,  IT,  LI,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:PHENYLACETAMID-DERIVATE[1998/45]
English:PHENYLACETAMIDE DERIVATIVES[1998/45]
French:DERIVES DE PHENYLACETAMIDE[1998/45]
Entry into regional phase12.06.1998National basic fee paid 
12.06.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
12.06.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.07.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: AT
12.06.1998Examination requested  [1998/45]
08.11.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
09.03.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.06.2000Fee for grant paid
07.06.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)21.06.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.12.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
29.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipNL20.09.2000
SE20.12.2000
[2003/09]
Former [2001/27]SE20.12.2000
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0525360  (KOREA RES INST CHEM TECH [KR]);
 [A]US5220064  (JOHNSON GRAHAM [US], et al)