blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0861267

EP0861267 - INDUCING RESISTANCE TO TUMOR GROWTH WITH SOLUBLE IGF-1 RECEPTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  20.06.2003
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip20.06.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 06.08.2003  [2003/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY
1020 Walnut Avenue Philadelphia
Pennsylvania 19107 / US
[N/P]
Former [1998/36]For all designated states
THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY
11th and Walnut Streets
Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19107 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BASERGA, Renato
125 Bleddyn Road
Ardmore, PA 19003 / US
02 / RESNICOFF, Mariana
Apartment 2617, 1500 Locust Street
Philadelphia, PA 19102 / US
03 / D'AMBROSIO, Consuelo
1014 Spruce Street
Philadelphia, PA 19107 / US
04 / FERBER, Andres
623 Lombard Street
Philadelphia, PA 19147 / US
[1998/42]
Former [1998/36]01 / BASERGA, Renato
125 Bleddyn Road
Ardmore, PA 19003 / US
02 / RESNICOFF, Mariana
Apartment 2617, 1500 Locust Street
Philadelphia, PA 19102 / US
03 / D'AMBROSIO, Consuelo
1014 Spruce Street
Philadelphia, PA 19107 / US
04 / FERBER, Andre
623 Lombard Street
Philadelphia, PA 19147 / US
Representative(s)Hallybone, Huw George
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/36]Hallybone, Huw George
CARPMAELS AND RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Application number, filing date96941358.213.11.1996
[1998/36]
WO1996US18327
Priority number, dateUS19950006699P14.11.1995         Original published format: US 6699 P
[1998/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9718241
Date:22.05.1997
Language:EN
[1997/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0861267
Date:02.09.1998
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1998/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US22.05.1997
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.12.1999
ClassificationIPC:C07K14/71, A61K38/17, A61K48/00, C12N5/10, C12N15/12
[1998/36]
CPC:
C07K14/71 (EP,US); A61P35/00 (EP); C07K14/72 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US); A61K48/00 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1998/36]
TitleGerman:INDUKTION UND RESISTENZ GEGEN TUMORWACHSTUM MITTELS LOESLICHEM IGF-1[1998/36]
English:INDUCING RESISTANCE TO TUMOR GROWTH WITH SOLUBLE IGF-1 RECEPTOR[1998/36]
French:METHODE POUR PROVOQUER UNE RESISTANCE A LA CROISSANCE DE TUMEURS AU MOYEN D'UN RECEPTEUR DE IGF-1 SOLUBLE[1998/36]
Entry into regional phase04.06.1998National basic fee paid 
04.06.1998Search fee paid 
04.06.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
04.06.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.06.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
04.06.1998Examination requested  [1998/36]
21.08.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.01.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/32]
06.03.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2003/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.06.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
12.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
28.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
14.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200207   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9423034  (CEDARS SINAI MEDICAL CENTER [US]) [X] 1-21 * the whole document *;
 [A]  - YAMASAKI H. ET AL., "Human insulin-like growth factor I receptor 950 tyrosine is required for somatotroph growth factor signal transduction", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (1992), vol. 267, pages 20953 - 20958, XP000857347 [A] 1
 [A]  - YAMASAKI H. ET AL., "Structure-function of the human insuline-like growth factor-I receptor: a discordance of somatotroph internalization and signaling", MOLECULAR ENDOCRINOLOGY, (1993), vol. 7, pages 681 - 685, XP000856912 [A] 1

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1210/me.7.5.681
 [A]  - YAMASAKI H. ET AL., "Binding and action of insulin-like growth factor I in pituitary tumor cells", ENDOCRINOLOGY, (1991), vol. 128, no. 2, pages 857 - 862, XP000856902 [A] 1-21
International search[Y]WO9117252  (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK]);
 [A]US5262308  (BASERGA RENATO [US]);
 [Y]WO9422486  (UNIV JEFFERSON [US], et al)
 [Y]  - THE EMBO JOURNAL, 1986, Vol. 5, No. 10, ULLRICH et al., "Insulin-like Growth Factor lambda Receptor Suggests Structural Determinants That Define Functional Specificity", pages 2503-2512.
 [Y]  - JOURNAL OF CELLULAR PHYSIOLOGY, 1991, Vol. 149, CAMPBELL P.G. et al., "Insulin-Like Growth Factor Binding Protein (IGFBP) Inhibits IGF Action on Human Osteosarcoma Cells", pages 293-300.
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.