Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0865271

EP0865271 - Use of 2-ethylhexyl alpha-cyano-beta,beta-diphenylacrylate in order to improve the photostability of p-methylbenzylidene camphor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1998/39]STABILISED SUNSCREEN COMPOSITIONS
[2002/49]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  30.01.2004
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2005Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
L'Oréal
14, rue Royale
75008 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [1998/39]For all designated states
L'OREAL
14, rue Royale
75008 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / HANSENNE, Isabelle
156, rue Legendre
F-75017 Paris / FR
02 / JOSSO, Martin
3, rue Jacob
F-75006 Paris / FR
[1998/39]
Representative(s)Bulle, Françoise , et al
Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 71/73
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/32]Bulle, Françoise , et al
Bureau D.A. Casalonga-Josse Paul-Heyse-Strasse 33
80336 München / DE
Former [1998/39]Miszputen, Laurent
L'OREAL Département Propriété Industrielle Centre Charles Zviak 90, rue du Général Roguet
92583 Clichy Cédex / FR
Application number, filing date96941708.805.12.1996
[1998/39]
WO1996FR01945
Priority number, dateFR1995001457908.12.1995         Original published format: FR 9514579
[1998/39]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9721422
Date:19.06.1997
Language:FR
[1997/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0865271
Date:23.09.1998
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.06.1997
[1998/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0865271
Date:19.01.2000
Language:FR
[2000/03]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0865271
Date:17.03.2004
Language:FR
[2004/12]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP19.06.1997
ClassificationInternational:A61K7/42
[1998/39]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1998/39]
TitleGerman:Verwendung von 2-Ethylhexyl-alpha-cyano-beta, beta-diphenylacrylat zur Verbesserung der Lichtstabilität von p-Methylbenzylidencampher[2002/49]
English:Use of 2-ethylhexyl alpha-cyano-beta,beta-diphenylacrylate in order to improve the photostability of p-methylbenzylidene camphor[2002/49]
French:Utilisation de l' alpha-cyano-béta, béta-diphénylacrylate de 2-éthylhexyle en vue d' améliorer la stabilité à la lumière du p-méthyl benzylidène camphre[2002/49]
Former [1998/39]STABILISIERTES SONNENSCHUTZMITTEL
Former [1998/39]STABILISED SUNSCREEN COMPOSITIONS
Former [1998/39]COMPOSITIONS DE PROTECTION SOLAIRES STABILISEES
Entry into regional phase08.07.1998National basic fee paid 
08.07.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
08.07.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.06.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
08.07.1998Examination requested  [1998/39]
16.09.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
15.11.1999Fee for grant paid
15.11.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
23.11.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  12.10.2000   
Merck Patent GmbH
Postfach
Frankfurter Strasse 250
64293 Darmstadt / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2000/49]
Opponent(s)01  12.10.2000   
Merck Patent GmbH
Postfach Frankfurter Strasse 250
D-64293 Darmstadt / DE
22.11.2000Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
11.05.2001Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
10.10.2002Date of oral proceedings
23.10.2002Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
23.10.2002Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
04.11.2003Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
07.11.2003Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
15.01.2004Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition19.12.2002Appeal received No.  T0071/03
05.03.2003Statement of grounds filed
21.10.2003Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent inadmissible
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.12.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
15.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE31.12.2000
[2002/03]
Cited inInternational search[X]EP0685225  (OREAL [FR]) [X] 1-8 * page 3, line 5 - line 12; examples 2,3 *;
 [A]WO9404131  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1-8 * claims 1,4,6 *;
 [A]EP0678292  (OREAL [FR]) [A] 1-8 * claims 1,3,6,36-38 *;
 [A]EP0685228  (OREAL [FR]) [A] 1-8 * column W *
OppositionDE3741420
 WO9111989