EP1019432 - THE OB RECEPTOR AND METHODS OF DIAGNOSING AND TREATING WEIGHT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.11.2012 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 13.11.2013 [2013/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MILLENNIUM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. 73 Sidney Street Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/29] | For all designated states Millennium Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Fifth floor, 640 Memorial Drive Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TARTAGLIA, Louis A. Apartment 6 104 Coolidge Hill Road Watertown, MA 02172 / US | 02 /
TEPPER, Robert, I. 53 Laurel Road Weston, MA 02193 / US | 03 /
CULPEPPER, Janice, A. 1734 Beacon Street Brookline, MA 02146 / US | 04 /
WHITE, David, W. 393 Pine Street Holbrook, MA 02343 / US | [2012/02] |
Former [2000/29] | 01 /
TARTAGLIA, Louis A. Apartment 6, 104 Coolidge Hill Road Watertown, MA 02172 / US | ||
02 /
TEPPER, Robert, I. 53 Laurel Road Weston, MA 02193 / US | |||
03 /
CULPEPPER, Janice, A. 1734 Beacon Street Brookline, MA 02146 / US | |||
04 /
WHITE, David, W. 393 Pine Street Holbrook, MA 02343 / US | Representative(s) | Price, Vincent Andrew, et al Fry Heath & Spence LLP The Gables Massetts Road Horley Surrey RH6 7DQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/29] | Price, Vincent Andrew, et al FRY HEATH & SPENCE The Old College 53 High Street Horley Surrey RH6 7BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 96942110.6 | 27.11.1996 | [2000/29] | WO1996US19128 | Priority number, date | US19950562663 | 27.11.1995 Original published format: US 562663 | US19950566622 | 04.12.1995 Original published format: US 566622 | US19950569485 | 08.12.1995 Original published format: US 569485 | US19950570142 | 11.12.1995 Original published format: US 570142 | US19950583153 | 28.12.1995 Original published format: US 583153 | US19960599455 | 22.01.1996 Original published format: US 599455 | US19960638524 | 26.04.1996 Original published format: US 638524 | US19960708123 | 03.09.1996 Original published format: US 708123 | [2000/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9719952 | Date: | 05.06.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1019432 | Date: | 19.07.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.06.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1019432 | Date: | 11.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.06.1997 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C07H21/04, C07K14/705, C07K14/71, C07K14/715, C07K16/28, C07K16/46, C12Q1/68, C12Q1/00, C12Q1/02, G01N33/53, C12P21/00 | [2000/29] | CPC: |
C07K14/715 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
C07K2319/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/29] | Title | German: | OB-REZEPTOR UND VERFAHREN ZUR DIAGNOSE UND BEHANDLUNG VON GEWICHT | [2000/29] | English: | THE OB RECEPTOR AND METHODS OF DIAGNOSING AND TREATING WEIGHT | [2000/29] | French: | RECEPTEUR OB ET PROCEDES DE DIAGNOSTIC ET DE TRAITEMENT DES DEREGLEMENTS DE LA MASSE CORPORELLE | [2000/29] | Entry into regional phase | 17.06.1998 | National basic fee paid | 17.06.1998 | Search fee paid | 03.06.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.06.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.06.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 17.06.1998 | Examination requested [2000/29] | 08.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.04.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.08.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 09.08.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.12.2003 | Opposition(s) | 12.10.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 25.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 24.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.01.2012 | BE | 11.01.2012 | DK | 11.01.2012 | FI | 11.01.2012 | IT | 11.01.2012 | NL | 11.01.2012 | SE | 11.01.2012 | GR | 12.04.2012 | ES | 22.04.2012 | PT | 11.05.2012 | [2013/46] |
Former [2013/07] | AT | 11.01.2012 | |
BE | 11.01.2012 | ||
DK | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
IT | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
SE | 11.01.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
DK | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
IT | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
SE | 11.01.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
DK | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
SE | 11.01.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
SE | 11.01.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/33] | BE | 11.01.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [E]WO9725425 (GENENTECH INC [US]) [E] 1-10 * figure 1 *; | [E]WO9725424 (AMGEN INC [US], et al) [E] 1-10 * page 64 - page 79 *; | [E]WO9712037 (AMRAD OPERATIONS PTY LTD [AU], et al) [E] 1-10 * figure 2; example 9 * | [X] - STEPHENS T W ET AL, "THE ROLE OF NEUROPEPTIDE Y IN THE ANTIOBESITY ACTION OF THE OBESE GENE PRODUCT", NATURE, MACMILLAN JOURNALS LTD. LONDON, GB, (19951012), vol. 377, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 530 - 532, XP000999194 [X] 1-10 * page 531, column R, paragraph 1; figure 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/377530a0 | [X] - MAFFEI MARGHERITA ET AL, "Increased expression in adipocytes of ob RNA in mice with lesions of the hypothalamus and with mutations at the db locus.", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES, 1995, (1995), vol. 92, no. 15, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 6957 - 6960, XP002209604 [X] 1-10 * page 6959, column L; figure 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.92.15.6957 | [PX] - TARTAGLIA L A ET AL, "IDENTIFICATION AND EXPRESSION CLONING OF A LEPTIN RECEPTOR, OB-R", CELL, CELL PRESS, CAMBRIDGE, NA, US, (19951229), vol. 83, no. 7, ISSN 0092-8674, pages 1263 - 1271, XP000602068 [PX] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0092-8674(95)90151-5 | International search | [Y]WO9307294 (US HEALTH [US]); | [XP]WO9608510 (PROGENITOR INC [US]) | [XP] - NATURE MEDICINE, May 1996, Vol. 2, No. 5, COIFFI et al., "Novel B219/OB Receptor Isoforms: Possible Role of Leptin in Hematopoiesis and Reproduction", pages 585-589. | [XP] - SCIENCE, 16 February 1996, Vol. 271, CHUA et al., "Phenotypes of Mouse Diabetes and Rat Fatty Due to Mutations in the OB (Leptin) Receptor", pages 994-996. | [XP] - CELL, February 1996, Vol. 84, CHEN et al., "Evidence that the Diabetes Gene Encodes the Leptin Receptor: Identification of a Mutation in the Leptin Receptor Gene in db/db Mice", pages 491-495. | [XP] - FEBS, August 1996, Vol. 392, WANG et al., "A Novel Leptin Receptor Isoform in Rat", pages 87-90. | [XP] - NATURE, 15 February 1996, Vol. 395, LEE et al., "Abnormal Splicing of the Leptin Receptor in Diabetic Mice", pages 632-635. | [XP] - DIABETES, July 1996, Vol. 19, CONSIDINE et al., "The Hypothalamic Leptin Receptor in Humans: Identification of Incidential Sequence Polymorphisms and Absence of the db/db and fa/fa Rat Mutations", pages 992-994. | [Y] - CURRENT PROTOCOLS IN IMMUNOLOGY, New York, 1992, HOLLENBAUGH et al., pages 10.19.1-10.19.11. | [Y] - CURRENT OPINION IN BIOTECHNOLOGY, 1995, Vol. 6, SEED et al., "Developments in Expression Cloning", pages 567-573. | [Y] - SEALFON, STUART, "Receptor Molecular Biology: Methods in Neuroscience", SAN DIEGO: ACADEMIC PRESS, 1995, Vol. 25, pages 278-301 and 470-509. | [Y] - MOLECULAR AND CELLULAR BIOLOGY, February 1992, Vol. 12, No. 2, REDEMANN et al., "Anti-Oncogenic Activity of Signalling-Defective Epidermal Growth Factor Receptor Mutants", pages 491-498. | [Y] - PHARMACEUTICAL TECHNOLOGY, October 1994, WU-PONG S., "Oligonucleotides: Opportunities for Drug Therapy and Research", pages 102-114. | [Y] - SCIENCE, 20 August 1993, Vol. 261, STEIN et al., "Antisense Oligonucleotides as Therapeutic Agents-Is the Bullet Really Magical?", pages 1004-112. | [Y] - ANTIVIRAL CHEMISTRY & CHEMOTHERAPY, 1991, Vol. 2, No. 4, JAMES W., "Towards Gene-Inhibition Therapy: A Review of Progress and Prospects in the Field of Antiviral Antisense Nucleic Acids and Ribozymes", pages 191-214. | [Y] - PHARMACEUTICAL RESEARCH, 1995, Vol. 12, No. 4, STULL et al., "Antigene, Ribozymes and Aptamer Nucleic Acid Drugs: Progress and Prospects", pages 465-483. | [Y] - PARASITOLOGY TODAY, 1994, Vol. 10, No. 3, MILLER et al., "Gene Transfer and Antisense Nucleic Acid Techniques", pages 92-97. | [Y] - SCIENCE, 1993, Vol. 260, MULLIGAN R., "The Basic Science of Gene Therapy", pages 926-931. | [Y] - HUMAN GENE THERAPY, September 1995, Vol. 6, LEDLEY F., "Nonviral Gene Therapy: The Promise of Genes as Pharmaceutical Products", pages 1120-1144. | [Y] - SCIENCE, 27 October 1995, Vol. 270, GURA T., "Antisense Has Growing Pains", pages 575-577. | [A] - BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMM., 26 April 1995, Vol. 209, No. 3, MURAKAMI et al., "Cloning of Rat Obese cDNA and Its Expression in Obese Rats", pages 944-952. |