Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0959834

EP0959834 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING TRANSDERMAL PATCHES (TTS) [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.12.2002
Database last updated on 28.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip27.12.2002No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 05.02.2003  [2003/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LTS LOHMANN Therapie-Systeme AG
Lohmannstrasse 2
56626 Andernach / DE
[2000/28]
Former [1999/48]For all designated states
LTS LOHMANN Therapie-Systeme GmbH
Irlicher Strasse 55
56567 Neuwied / DE
Inventor(s)01 / ASMUSSEN, Bodo
Im Schlossgarten 10
D-56170 Bendorf / DE
02 / HILLE, Thomas
Am Moogsberg 2a
D-56567 Neuwied / DE
03 / SCHUMANN, Klaus
Boesnerstrasse 6
D-56567 Neuwied / DE
04 / STEINBORN, Peter
Im Aubisch 20
D-56567 Neuwied / DE
[1999/48]
Representative(s)Flaccus, Rolf-Dieter , et al
Flaccus Müller-Wolff
Patentanwälte
Bussardweg 10
50389 Wesseling / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/28]Flaccus, Rolf-Dieter, Dr. , et al
Patentanwalt Bussardweg 10
50389 Wesseling / DE
Former [1999/48]Flaccus, Rolf-Dieter, Dr.
Patentanwalt Bussardweg 10
50389 Wesseling / DE
Application number, filing date96942340.904.12.1996
[1999/48]
WO1996EP05410
Priority number, dateDE199514769120.12.1995         Original published format: DE 19547691
[1999/48]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9722315
Date:26.06.1997
Language:DE
[1997/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0959834
Date:01.12.1999
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.06.1997
[1999/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0959834
Date:13.02.2002
Language:DE
[2002/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.06.1997
ClassificationInternational:A61F13/02
[1999/48]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [1999/48]
Extension statesSI14.05.1998
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG TRANSDERMALER THERAPEUTISCHER PFLASTER (TTS)[1999/48]
English:METHOD FOR PRODUCING TRANSDERMAL PATCHES (TTS)[1999/48]
French:PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE SYSTEMES THERAPEUTIQUES TRANSDERMIQUES[1999/48]
Entry into regional phase14.05.1998National basic fee paid 
14.05.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
14.05.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.06.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
14.05.1998Examination requested  [1999/48]
17.07.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
03.08.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.10.2001Fee for grant paid
26.10.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.11.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2003/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
12.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
20.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
26.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[A]GB2237262  (OSAKA SEALING LABEL PRINT [JP]) [A] 1 * page 11; figure 4 *;
 [A]WO9523687  (LOHMANN THERAPIE SYST LTS [DE], et al) [A] 1;
 [DA]DE4232279  (LOHMANN THERAPIE SYST LTS [DE])