Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0865497

EP0865497 - Allomelanin production [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1998/39]MELANIN PRODUCTION
[2001/50]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.08.2003
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.01.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 13.02.2008  [2008/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ZYLEPSIS LIMITED
6 Highpoint, Henwood Business Estate Ashford
Kent TN24 8DH / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/39]For all designated states
ZYLEPSIS LIMITED
6 Highpoint, Henwood Business Estate
Ashford, Kent TN24 8DH / GB
Inventor(s)01 / BANISTER, Nigel, Eric
52 Rochester Avenue
Canterbury Kent CT1 3YE / GB
02 / CHEETHAM, Peter, Samuel, James
35 Rochester Avenue
Canterbury Kent CT1 3YE / GB
[1998/39]
Representative(s)Thomas, Philip John Duval , et al
Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/39]Thomas, Philip John Duval , et al
Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk
Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB
Application number, filing date96942438.109.12.1996
[1998/39]
WO1996GB03015
Priority number, dateGB1995002499707.12.1995         Original published format: GB 9524997
GB1995002542813.12.1995         Original published format: GB 9525428
[1998/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9720944
Date:12.06.1997
Language:EN
[1997/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0865497
Date:23.09.1998
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.06.1997
[1998/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0865497
Date:25.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.06.1997
ClassificationInternational:C12P17/00, C09B69/10, A61K7/00
[1998/39]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LU,   NL,   SE [1998/39]
TitleGerman:Herstellung von Allomelanin[2001/50]
English:Allomelanin production[2001/50]
French:Production d'allomelanines[2001/50]
Former [1998/39]HERSTELLUNG VON MELANIN
Former [1998/39]MELANIN PRODUCTION
Former [1998/39]PRODUCTION DE MELANINES
Entry into regional phase07.07.1998National basic fee paid 
07.07.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
07.07.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.07.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
07.07.1998Examination requested  [1998/39]
28.07.1999Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.07.1999Request for accelerated examination filed
30.09.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.09.1999Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
28.01.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.02.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.04.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.06.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.09.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.11.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.03.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.07.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.10.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.12.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
25.03.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
09.04.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.07.2002Fee for grant paid
02.07.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.12.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
09.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
13.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
13.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE25.09.2002
IT25.09.2002
NL25.09.2002
LU09.12.2002
DK25.12.2002
SE25.12.2002
ES28.03.2003
[2008/07]
Former [2007/17]BE25.09.2002
NL25.09.2002
LU09.12.2002
DK25.12.2002
SE25.12.2002
ES28.03.2003
Former [2004/39]BE25.09.2002
NL25.09.2002
LU09.12.2002
SE25.12.2002
ES28.03.2003
Former [2004/04]BE25.09.2002
NL25.09.2002
SE25.12.2002
ES28.03.2003
Former [2003/48]BE25.09.2002
NL25.09.2002
SE25.12.2002
Former [2003/30]NL25.09.2002
SE25.12.2002
Former [2003/14]SE25.12.2002
Cited inInternational search[X]US5244497  (JUNINO ALEX [FR], et al) [X] 1-33;
 [X]US5227459  (PAWELEK JOHN [US], et al) [X] 1-33;
 [X]WO9200373  (BIOSOURCE GENETICS CORP [CA]) [X] 1-33