Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0865293

EP0865293 - BLOCKADE OF T LYMPHOCYTE DOWN-REGULATION ASSOCIATED WITH CTLA-4 SIGNALING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  21.10.2016
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip13.01.2017Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CH, LI
published on 15.02.2017  [2017/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Regents of the University of California
1111 Franklin Street, 12th Floor
Oakland, CA 94607 / US
[N/P]
Former [2009/17]For all designated states
The Regents of The University of California
1111 Franklin Street
Oakland CA 94607 / US
Former [2008/48]For all designated states
The Regents of the University of California
300 Lakeside Drive, 22nd Floor Oakland
California 94612-3550 / US
Former [1998/39]For all designated states
THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA
300 Lakeside Drive, 22nd Floor
Oakland, California 94612-3550 / US
Inventor(s)01 / ALLISON, James, Patrick
920 Oxford Street
Berkeley, CA 94707 / US
02 / LEACH, Dana, R.
1260 Brighton Avenue 205
Albany, CA 94706 / US
03 / KRUMMEL, Matthew, F.
1783 Spruce Street 3
Berkeley, CA 94709 / US
[1998/39]
Representative(s)Walton, Seán Malcolm , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/39]Walton, Seán Malcolm , et al
MEWBURN ELLIS, York House, 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Application number, filing date96942901.804.12.1996
[1998/39]
WO1996US19375
Priority number, dateUS1995056685304.12.1995         Original published format: US 566853
US1996064660508.05.1996         Original published format: US 646605
[1998/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9720574
Date:12.06.1997
Language:EN
[1997/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0865293
Date:23.09.1998
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.06.1997
[1998/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0865293
Date:26.11.2008
Language:EN
[2008/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US12.06.1997
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.12.2001
ClassificationInternational:A61K38/16, A61K39/395, C07K14/47, C07K14/705, C07K14/725, C07K16/28
[1998/39]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1998/39]
TitleGerman:BEHINDERUNG DER UNTERDRÜCKUNG VON T LYMPHOZYTEN IM ZUSAMMENHANG MIT DER CTLA-4 SIGNALÜBERTRAGUNG[1998/39]
English:BLOCKADE OF T LYMPHOCYTE DOWN-REGULATION ASSOCIATED WITH CTLA-4 SIGNALING[1998/39]
French:BLOCAGE DE LA RETRO-REGULATION DE LYMPHOCYTES T ASSOCIEE A LA SIGNALISATION PAR CTLA-4[1998/39]
Entry into regional phase24.06.1998National basic fee paid 
24.06.1998Search fee paid 
24.06.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
24.06.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.07.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
24.06.1998Examination requested  [1998/39]
04.11.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.09.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.01.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.11.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.11.2004Observations by third parties
15.02.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.12.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.12.2005Observations by third parties
25.04.2006Observations by third parties
08.05.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.12.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
01.03.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.03.2007Observations by third parties
17.09.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.03.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.06.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.10.2008Fee for grant paid
10.10.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP08020208.8  / EP2106800
EP10180032.4  / EP2332561
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  26.08.2009  15.10.2009  ADMISSIBLE
Pfizer, Inc.
235 East 42nd Street
New York, NY 10017-5755 / US
Opponent's representative
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
 [2015/36]
Former [2009/43]
Opponent(s)01  26.08.2009   
Pfizer, Inc.
235 East 42nd Street
New York, NY 10017-5755 / US
Opponent's representative
Harding, Charles Thomas, et al
D Young & Co 120 Holborn
GB-London EC1N 2DY / GB
Former [2009/41]
Opponent(s)01  26.08.2009   
Pfizer Vaccines LLC
253 East, 42nd Street
New York NY 10017-5755 / US
Opponent's representative
Harding, Charles Thomas, et al
D Young & Co 120 Holborn
GB-London EC1N 2DY / GB
20.10.2009Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
28.04.2010Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
02.12.2010Date of oral proceedings
16.12.2010Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
16.12.2010Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
09.06.2016Legal effect of revocation of patent [2016/47]
Appeal following opposition25.01.2011Appeal received No.  T0171/11
26.04.2011Statement of grounds filed
09.06.2016Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected
09.06.2016Date of oral proceedings
15.06.2016Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Request for further processing for:01.03.2007Request for further processing filed
01.03.2007Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
14.03.2007Decision despatched
09.12.2005Request for further processing filed
09.12.2005Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
22.12.2005Decision despatched
02.11.2004Request for further processing filed
02.11.2004Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
22.11.2004Decision despatched
01.09.2003Request for further processing filed
01.09.2003Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
29.09.2003Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
19.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
20.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
31.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
23.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
29.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 08
23.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 09
27.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 10
27.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 11
24.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 12
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCH26.11.2008
LI26.11.2008
IT04.12.2015
[2017/07]
Former [2017/04]IT04.12.2015
Documents cited:Search[XY]  - ALLISON JP, KRUMMEL MF, "The yin and yang of T cell costimulation", SCIENCE, (19951110), vol. 270, pages 932 - 933, XP002181753 [X] 1-13 * column W * [Y] 1-13

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.270.5238.932
 [Y]  - HUANG Y-W ET AL, "IMMUNOTHERAPY OF MULTIPLE MYELOMA", STEM CELLS, ALPHAMED PRESS, DAYTON, OH, US, (19950301), vol. 13, no. 2, ISSN 1066-5099, pages 123 - 134, XP000579668 [Y] 1-13 * column A * * page 124, column R, paragraph L * * page 129, column L, paragraphs 1-3 *
 [A]  - ROSENTHAL F M ET AL, "HUMAN TUMOR VACCINES AND GENETIC ENGINEERING OF TUMORS WITH CYTOKINE AND HISTOCOMPATIBILITY GENES TO ENHANCE IMMUNOGENICITY", CURRENT OPINION IN ONCOLOGY, CURRENT SCIENCE LTD, US, (19941101), ISSN 1040-8746, pages 611 - 615, XP000764193 [A] 1-13 * column W *
 [A]  - TJOA B A ET AL, "GENERATION OF CYTOTOXIC T-LYMPHOCYTES TO A SELF-PEPTIDE/CLASS I COMPLEX: A MODEL FOR PEPTIDE-MEDIATED TUMOR REJECTION", CANCER RESEARCH, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH, BALTIMORE, MD, US, (19940101), vol. 54, no. 1, ISSN 0008-5472, pages 204 - 208, XP001031345 [A] 1-13 * column W *
International search[YP]US5556763
 [Y]  - KEARNEY E R, ET AL., "ANTIGEN-DEPENDENT CLONAL EXPANSION OF A TRACE POPULATION OF ANTIGEN-SPECIFIC CD4+ T CELLS IN VIVO IS DEPENDENT ON CD28 COSTIMULATION AND INHBITED BY CTLA-4", THE JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, The American Association of Immunologists, US, US, (19950101), vol. 155, ISSN 0022-1767, pages 1032 - 1036, XP002909824
 [Y]  - WALUNAS T. L., ET AL., "CTLA-4 CAN FUNCTION AS A NEGATIVE REGULATOR OF T CELL ACTIVATION.", IMMUNITY., CELL PRESS., US, US, (19940801), vol. 01., doi:10.1016/1074-7613(94)90071-X, ISSN 1074-7613, pages 405 - 413., XP000891380

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/1074-7613(94)90071-X
other   - LEACH D.R. ET AL., "ENHANCEMENT OF ANTITUMOR IMMUNITY BY CTLA-4 BLOCKADE", SCIENCE, (19960322), vol. 271, pages 1734 - 1736, XP000986211

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.271.5256.1734
    - GRIBBEN J.G. ET AL., "CTLA4 MEDIATES ANTIGEN-SPECIFIC APOPTOSIS OF HUMAN T CELLS", PNAS, (1995), vol. 92, pages 811 - 815, XP000604676

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.92.3.811
    - ZITVOGEL L. ET AL., "INTERLEUKIN-12 AND B7.1 CO-STIMULATION COOPERATE IN THE INDUCTION OF EFFECTIVE ANTITUMOR IMMUNITY AND THERAPY OF ESTABLISHED TUMORS", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, (19960626), vol. 6, pages 1335 - 1341, XP000914702

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/eji.1830260624
    - PARDOLL D., "Releasing the Brakes on Antitumor Immune Response", SCIENCE, (19960322), vol. 271, no. 5256, page 1691, XP002989719

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.271.5256.1691
    - PARDOLL D.M., "Cancer Vaccines", TIPS, (199305), vol. 14, pages 202 - 208, XP002996809

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0165-6147(93)90209-3
    - HURWITZ A A; ET AL, "CTLA-4 BLOCKADE SYNERGIZES WITH TUMOR-DERIVED GRANULOCYTE-MACROPHAGE COLONY-STIMULATING FACTOR FOR TREATMENT OF AN EXPERIMENTAL MAMMARY CARCINOMA", PNAS, (199808), vol. 95, no. 17, pages 10067 - 10071, XP000882999

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.95.17.10067