Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0865293 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0865293



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 2236
17.10.2016 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 1
14.10.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
12.10.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
12.10.2016 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
12.10.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
07.10.2016 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 15
07.10.2016 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
07.10.2016 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
15.06.2016 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 5
26.10.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
15.10.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
13.10.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
13.10.2015 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
13.10.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
09.10.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
06.10.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
06.10.2015 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
06.10.2015 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 4
06.10.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
30.09.2015 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
29.09.2015 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 1
29.09.2015 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 1
24.09.2015 F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing Appeal 1
31.07.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Appeal 3
31.07.2015 Communication of amended entries Appeal 2
02.07.2015 Request for change of opponent's representative Appeal 1
02.06.2015 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 2
02.06.2015 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 2
11.05.2015 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
08.05.2015 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
17.04.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
09.04.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
07.04.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
27.03.2015 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 2
25.03.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
24.03.2015 F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing Appeal 1
23.03.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
23.03.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
20.03.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
20.03.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
20.03.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
20.03.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
20.03.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
20.03.2015 Oral proceedings: Request for postponement Appeal 1
20.03.2015 Oral proceedings: Request for postponement Appeal 3
12.03.2015 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
12.03.2015 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
09.03.2015 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
06.08.2014 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
23.07.2014 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
06.06.2013 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 3
06.06.2013 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 3
06.05.2013 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
29.04.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
29.04.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
29.04.2013 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Search / examination 15
29.04.2013 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Search / examination 9
29.04.2013 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Search / examination 8
29.04.2013 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Search / examination 1
24.10.2012 F3303.17 Change of the composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member Appeal 1
23.04.2012 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
11.04.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
11.04.2012 Claims Opposition 1
11.04.2012 Claims Opposition 2
11.04.2012 Claims Opposition 1
11.04.2012 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Opposition 12
11.04.2012 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Opposition 2
13.09.2011 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
08.09.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
08.09.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
08.09.2011 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Search / examination 11
08.09.2011 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Search / examination 28
08.09.2011 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Search / examination 22
08.09.2011 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Search / examination 5
08.09.2011 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Search / examination 1
08.09.2011 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Search / examination 9
08.09.2011 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Search / examination 7
08.09.2011 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Search / examination 1
08.09.2011 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Search / examination 69
08.09.2011 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Search / examination 127
08.09.2011 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Search / examination 5
08.09.2011 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Search / examination 10
12.07.2011 F3303.14 Composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member Appeal 1
28.04.2011 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
26.04.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
26.04.2011 Claims Appeal 1
26.04.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
26.04.2011 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 13
26.04.2011 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
26.04.2011 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
26.04.2011 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 10
26.04.2011 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 10
26.04.2011 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
26.04.2011 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
26.04.2011 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 15
31.01.2011 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
25.01.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
25.01.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
25.01.2011 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
25.01.2011 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
24.12.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
23.12.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
22.12.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
16.12.2010 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 2
16.12.2010 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 28
16.12.2010 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
16.12.2010 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 8
10.12.2010 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
02.12.2010 Claims Opposition 1
02.12.2010 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
17.11.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
15.11.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
15.11.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
15.11.2010 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
15.10.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.10.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.10.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.10.2010 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 41
06.10.2010 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 23
06.10.2010 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 3
06.10.2010 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 2
06.10.2010 Claims Opposition 1
06.10.2010 Claims Opposition 2
06.10.2010 Claims Opposition 2
06.10.2010 Claims Opposition 2
06.10.2010 Claims Opposition 2
06.10.2010 Claims Opposition 2
06.10.2010 Claims Opposition 2
06.10.2010 Claims Opposition 2
06.10.2010 Claims Opposition 1
06.10.2010 Claims Opposition 2
06.10.2010 Claims Opposition 2
06.10.2010 Claims Opposition 2
06.10.2010 Claims Opposition 2
06.10.2010 Claims Opposition 1
06.10.2010 Claims Opposition 2
06.10.2010 Claims Opposition 2
06.10.2010 Claims Opposition 2
06.10.2010 Claims Opposition 1
06.10.2010 Claims Opposition 2
06.10.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 26
06.10.2010 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 5
01.10.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
01.10.2010 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 2
01.10.2010 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 3
01.10.2010 Claims Opposition 1
01.10.2010 Claims Opposition 2
01.10.2010 Claims Opposition 2
01.10.2010 Claims Opposition 2
01.10.2010 Claims Opposition 2
01.10.2010 Claims Opposition 2
01.10.2010 Claims Opposition 1
01.10.2010 Claims Opposition 2
01.10.2010 Claims Opposition 2
01.10.2010 Claims Opposition 2
01.10.2010 Claims Opposition 1
01.10.2010 Claims Opposition 2
01.10.2010 Claims Opposition 2
01.10.2010 Claims Opposition 2
01.10.2010 Claims Opposition 2
01.10.2010 Claims Opposition 2
01.10.2010 Claims Opposition 2
01.10.2010 Claims Opposition 1
01.10.2010 Claims Opposition 2
01.10.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
01.10.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
01.10.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
01.10.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
01.10.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
01.10.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
01.10.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
01.10.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
01.10.2010 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 42
01.10.2010 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 5
05.07.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
05.07.2010 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
30.06.2010 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
24.06.2010 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 23
24.06.2010 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
24.06.2010 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 46
24.06.2010 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 7
24.06.2010 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 78
24.06.2010 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
24.06.2010 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
14.06.2010 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
06.05.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.05.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.04.2010 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 5
30.04.2010 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 37
30.04.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
30.04.2010 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
30.04.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 30
30.04.2010 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 24
28.04.2010 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 24
31.03.2010 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent Opposition 1
18.02.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
18.02.2010 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
16.02.2010 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
12.02.2010 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
17.11.2009 Request for change of address - applicant Opposition 1
20.10.2009 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
20.10.2009 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
18.09.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
18.09.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.09.2009 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
11.09.2009 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
11.09.2009 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
04.09.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.09.2009 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
27.08.2009 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
27.08.2009 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
27.08.2009 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
27.08.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
27.08.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
27.08.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
27.08.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
27.08.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
27.08.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
27.08.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
27.08.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
27.08.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
27.08.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
27.08.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
27.08.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
27.08.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
27.08.2009 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
27.08.2009 Notice of opposition Opposition 61
27.08.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 67
27.08.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
26.08.2009 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
26.08.2009 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
26.08.2009 Cover sheet for fax transmission Opposition 1
26.08.2009 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
26.08.2009 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
26.08.2009 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
26.08.2009 Notice of opposition Opposition 61
23.03.2009 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
09.03.2009 Request for change of address - applicant Search / examination 1
04.03.2009 Request for change of address - applicant Search / examination 2
28.11.2008 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
30.10.2008 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
13.10.2008 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
13.10.2008 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
13.10.2008 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
24.06.2008 Request for issuance of patent certificate with patent specification Search / examination 1
10.06.2008 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
10.06.2008 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
10.06.2008 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
10.06.2008 Text intended for grant Search / examination 79
07.03.2008 Claims Search / examination 3
07.03.2008 Description Search / examination 1
07.03.2008 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
01.02.2008 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
30.01.2008 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
28.01.2008 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
17.09.2007 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
17.09.2007 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
27.03.2007 Transmittal of third party observations to applicant Search / examination 1
20.03.2007 Observations by third parties Search / examination 13
14.03.2007 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
08.03.2007 Claims Search / examination 2
08.03.2007 Description Search / examination 3
08.03.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 12
08.03.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 2
08.03.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 5
08.03.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 1
08.03.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 17
08.03.2007 Request for further processing Search / examination 5
01.03.2007 Claims Search / examination 2
01.03.2007 Cover sheet for fax transmission Search / examination 1
01.03.2007 Description Search / examination 3
01.03.2007 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
01.03.2007 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
01.03.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 32
01.03.2007 Request for further processing Search / examination 5
22.12.2006 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
21.09.2006 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
11.09.2006 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
08.05.2006 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
08.05.2006 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
05.05.2006 Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations Search / examination 1
05.05.2006 Transmittal of third party observations to applicant Search / examination 1
25.04.2006 Observations by third parties Search / examination 8
05.01.2006 Transmittal of third party observations to applicant Search / examination 1
23.12.2005 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 7
23.12.2005 Non-patent literature filed by a third party Search / examination 5
23.12.2005 Observations by third parties Search / examination 7
22.12.2005 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
13.12.2005 Claims Search / examination 2
13.12.2005 Description Search / examination 12
13.12.2005 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
09.12.2005 Claims Search / examination 2
09.12.2005 Description Search / examination 12
09.12.2005 Request for further processing Search / examination 5
29.09.2005 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
06.06.2005 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
30.05.2005 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
15.02.2005 Annex to the communication Search / examination 7
15.02.2005 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
22.11.2004 Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations Search / examination 1
22.11.2004 Transmittal of third party observations to applicant Search / examination 1
12.11.2004 Annex Search / examination 3
12.11.2004 Annex Search / examination 9
12.11.2004 Citation filed by a third party Search / examination 67
12.11.2004 Citation filed by a third party Search / examination 24
12.11.2004 Observations by third parties Search / examination 11
05.11.2004 Claims Search / examination 2
05.11.2004 Description Search / examination 1
05.11.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
02.11.2004 Request for further processing Search / examination 9
30.08.2004 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
28.05.2004 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
25.05.2004 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
21.05.2004 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
11.03.2004 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
15.01.2004 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
15.01.2004 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
29.09.2003 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
03.09.2003 Annex Search / examination 5
03.09.2003 Claims Search / examination 4
03.09.2003 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 4
03.09.2003 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 30
03.09.2003 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 7
01.09.2003 Request for further processing Search / examination 17
20.06.2003 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
13.03.2003 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
28.02.2003 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
04.11.2002 Annex to the communication Search / examination 6
04.11.2002 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
26.04.2002 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
24.04.2002 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 2
11.03.2002 Extension of time limit granted Search / examination 1
22.02.2002 Request for extension of time limit Search / examination 1
19.02.2002 Request for extension of time limit Search / examination 2
21.12.2001 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
21.12.2001 European search report Search / examination 2
21.12.2001 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
21.12.2001 Supplemental sheet C (search incomplete) Search / examination 1
06.10.1998 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
06.10.1998 Sequence listing Search / examination 2
12.08.1998 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
30.07.1998 Deficiencies in sequence listing Search / examination 3
19.06.1998 Claims Search / examination 2
19.06.1998 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
19.06.1998 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
29.07.1997 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
12.06.1997 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
12.06.1997 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 98
12.06.1997 Priority document Search / examination 78
12.06.1997 Priority document Search / examination 46