Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0868181

EP0868181 - USE OF ALPHA,ALPHA-DIPHENYLACETIC ACID-4-(N-METHYL-PIPERIDYL)ESTER AS ANTI-SPASMODIC [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1998/41]USE OF $g(a),$g(a)-DIPHENYLACETIC ACID-4-(N-METHYL-PIPERIDYL)ESTER AS ANTI-SPASMODIC
[1999/18]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.03.2001
Database last updated on 20.02.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip30.08.2002Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 16.10.2002  [2002/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pein, Eckhart
Sohnreystrasse 16
37154 Northeim / DE
For all designated states
Ritter, Helmut
Rotdornweg 37
42111 Wuppertal / DE
For all designated states
Laven, Reinhard
Lindenstrasse 10
38259 Salzgitter / DE
[1998/41]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1998/41]
Representative(s)Hrabal, Ulrich
Gille Hrabal Struck Neidlein Prop Roos Brucknerstrasse 20
40593 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/41]Hrabal, Ulrich, Dr.
Türk, Gille, Hrabal, Leifert Brucknerstrasse 20
40593 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date96943125.314.12.1996
[1998/41]
WO1996EP05627
Priority number, dateDE199514762120.12.1995         Original published format: DE 19547621
[1998/41]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9722343
Date:26.06.1997
Language:DE
[1997/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0868181
Date:07.10.1998
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.06.1997
[1998/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0868181
Date:31.05.2000
Language:DE
[2000/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.06.1997
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/445
[1998/41]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1998/41]
Extension statesAL26.09.1997
LT26.09.1997
LV26.09.1997
RO26.09.1997
SI26.09.1997
TitleGerman:VERWENDUNG DES ALPHA,ALPHA-DIPHENYLESSIGSÄURE-4-(N-METHYL-PIPERIDYL)ESTERS ALS SPASMOANALGETIKUM[1999/18]
English:USE OF ALPHA,ALPHA-DIPHENYLACETIC ACID-4-(N-METHYL-PIPERIDYL)ESTER AS ANTI-SPASMODIC[1999/18]
French:UTILISATION D'ACIDE ALPHA,ALPHA-DIPHENYLACETIQUE -4-(N-METHYL-PIPERIDYL)ESTER COMME ANTISPASMODIQUE[1999/18]
Former [1998/41]VERWENDUNG DES $g(a),$g(a)-DIPHENYLESSIGSÄURE-4-(N-METHYL-PIPERIDYL)ESTERS ALS SPASMOANALGETIKUM
Former [1998/41]USE OF $g(a),$g(a)-DIPHENYLACETIC ACID-4-(N-METHYL-PIPERIDYL)ESTER AS ANTI-SPASMODIC
Former [1998/41]UTILISATION D'ACIDE $g(a),$g(a)-DIPHENYLACETIQUE -4-(N-METHYL-PIPERIDYL)ESTER COMME ANTISPASMODIQUE
Entry into regional phase26.09.1997National basic fee paid 
26.09.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
26.09.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.06.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
26.09.1997Examination requested  [1998/41]
23.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
15.10.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
09.11.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.02.2000Fee for grant paid
03.02.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)01.03.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.12.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
18.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipMC31.12.2000
[2002/42]
Cited inInternational search[AD]DE4205843  (SCHAPER & BRUEMMER GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1-4 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0445731  (WARNER LAMBERT CO [US]) [A] 1-4 * page 19, line 33 - line 37 *;
 [A]EP0335758  (ROUSSEL UCLAF [FR]) [A] 1-4 * page 3, line 7 - line 11 *;
 [A]US4678780  (DAVIS WILLIAM M [US]) [A] 1-4 * column 8, line 41 - line 50 *
 [X]  - R.J.GILBERT ET AL., "Effect of selective muscarinic antagonists on peristaltic contractions in opossum smooth muscle", AM.J.PHYSIOL., (1986), vol. 250, no. 1 Pt. 1, pages G50 - G59, XP000645243 [X] 1-4 * the whole document *
 [X]  - J.A.WATERS ET AL., "Anticonvulsant Activity of Piperidinol and (Dialkylamino)alkanol Esters", J.MED.CHEM., (1986), vol. 29, no. 8, pages 1512 - 1516, XP000647301 [X] 1-4 * page 1516, column R, line 13 - line 19; table I *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00158a032
 [X]  - D.F.BIGGS ET AL., "Stereochemical Studies of Antimuscarinic Agents. Diastereoisomeric Esters of 3-Tropanol, 1,3-Dimethyl-4-piperidinol, and Related Compounds", J.MED.CHEM., (1972), vol. 15, no. 5, pages 506 - 509, XP000647308 [X] 1-4 * page 506, column R *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00275a018
 [AD]  - P.A.LUCCHESI ET AL., "Interaction of agonists and selective antagonists with gastric smooth muscle muscarinic receptors", NAUNYN-SCHMIEDEBERG'S ARCH. PHARMACOL., (1989), vol. 339, no. 1-2, pages 145 - 151, XP000645257 [AD] 1-4 * page 147, column L *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00165136