EP0870359 - DIGITAL FREQUENCY GENERATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.01.2001 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shine, Thomas, Adam 190 Beacon Street Boston, MA 02116 / US | For all designated states Shine, Ian Basil 444 Central Park West New York, NY 10025 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/42] | For all designated states Shine, Thomas, Adam 190 Beacon Street Boston, MA 02116 / US | ||
For all designated states Shine, Ian, Basil 444 Central Park West New York, NY 10025 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1998/42] | Representative(s) | Ertl, Nicholas Justin, et al Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/52] | Ertl, Nicholas Justin, et al Elkington and Fife, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | ||
Former [1999/01] | Finnie, Peter John, et al Elkington and Fife, Beacon House, 113 Kingsway London WC2B 6PP / GB | ||
Former [1998/42] | Draper, Martyn John Gill Jennings & Every, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 96943255.8 | 27.12.1996 | [1998/42] | WO1996GB03240 | Priority number, date | GB19950026717 | 29.12.1995 Original published format: GB 9526717 | [1998/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9724797 | Date: | 10.07.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0870359 | Date: | 14.10.1998 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.07.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1998/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0870359 | Date: | 29.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.07.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H03B28/00 | [1998/42] | CPC: |
A61M5/172 (EP,US);
H02P8/14 (EP,US);
H03B28/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/42] | Title | German: | DIGITALER FREQUENZGENERATOR | [1998/42] | English: | DIGITAL FREQUENCY GENERATOR | [1998/42] | French: | GENERATEUR DE FREQUENCE NUMERIQUE | [1998/42] | Entry into regional phase | 17.07.1998 | National basic fee paid | 17.07.1998 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.07.1998 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.07.1997 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.07.1998 | Examination requested [1998/42] | 09.10.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.04.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.10.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.12.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 21.12.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.12.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.03.2000 | BE | 29.03.2000 | CH | 29.03.2000 | ES | 29.03.2000 | FI | 29.03.2000 | GR | 29.03.2000 | IT | 29.03.2000 | LI | 29.03.2000 | NL | 29.03.2000 | SE | 29.03.2000 | DK | 29.06.2000 | PT | 29.06.2000 | [2008/07] |
Former [2004/07] | AT | 29.03.2000 | |
BE | 29.03.2000 | ||
CH | 29.03.2000 | ||
ES | 29.03.2000 | ||
FI | 29.03.2000 | ||
GR | 29.03.2000 | ||
LI | 29.03.2000 | ||
NL | 29.03.2000 | ||
SE | 29.03.2000 | ||
DK | 29.06.2000 | ||
PT | 29.06.2000 | ||
Former [2003/46] | AT | 29.03.2000 | |
BE | 29.03.2000 | ||
CH | 29.03.2000 | ||
ES | 29.03.2000 | ||
FI | 29.03.2000 | ||
LI | 29.03.2000 | ||
NL | 29.03.2000 | ||
SE | 29.03.2000 | ||
DK | 29.06.2000 | ||
PT | 29.06.2000 | ||
Former [2003/09] | AT | 29.03.2000 | |
BE | 29.03.2000 | ||
CH | 29.03.2000 | ||
ES | 29.03.2000 | ||
FI | 29.03.2000 | ||
LI | 29.03.2000 | ||
NL | 29.03.2000 | ||
SE | 29.03.2000 | ||
PT | 29.06.2000 | ||
Former [2002/27] | AT | 29.03.2000 | |
BE | 29.03.2000 | ||
CH | 29.03.2000 | ||
ES | 29.03.2000 | ||
FI | 29.03.2000 | ||
LI | 29.03.2000 | ||
SE | 29.03.2000 | ||
PT | 29.06.2000 | ||
Former [2002/23] | AT | 29.03.2000 | |
BE | 29.03.2000 | ||
CH | 29.03.2000 | ||
FI | 29.03.2000 | ||
LI | 29.03.2000 | ||
SE | 29.03.2000 | ||
PT | 29.06.2000 | ||
Former [2002/02] | AT | 29.03.2000 | |
BE | 29.03.2000 | ||
CH | 29.03.2000 | ||
FI | 29.03.2000 | ||
LI | 29.03.2000 | ||
PT | 29.06.2000 | ||
Former [2001/29] | AT | 29.03.2000 | |
BE | 29.03.2000 | ||
FI | 29.03.2000 | ||
PT | 29.06.2000 | ||
Former [2001/09] | AT | 29.03.2000 | |
BE | 29.03.2000 | ||
PT | 29.06.2000 | ||
Former [2001/08] | AT | 29.03.2000 | |
BE | 29.03.2000 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4417189 (OVERFIELD DENNIS O [US]) [A] 1,8,12 * column 2, line 66 - column 4, line 4 *; | [A]US4604034 (WHEELDON PETER G [GB], et al) [A] 1,8,11-13 * column 4, line 16 - line 49 *; | [A]US4634426 (KAMEN DEAN L [US]) [A] 11-13* column 9, line 37 - column 10, line 9 *; | [A]US4661754 (TAJIMA TAIJI [JP], et al) [A] 1,8,12 * column 3, line 8 - column 4, line 9 * |