Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0812859

EP0812859 - ANTIFACTOR Xa-TISSUE FACTOR PATHWAY INHIBITOR COMPLEX MONOCLONAL ANTIBODY AND USE OF THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.12.2002
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.12.2002No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 05.02.2003  [2003/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
IATRON LABORATORIES, INC.
11-4 Higashi-Kanda 1-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 101 / JP
For all designated states
Juridical Foundation The Chemo-Sero-Therapeutic Research Institute
6-1, Okubo 1-chome Kumamoto-shi
Kumamoto 860-8568 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2002/07]For all designated states
IATRON LABORATORIES, INC.
11-4 Higashi-Kanda 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101 / JP
For all designated states
Juridical Foundation, The Chemo-Sero-Therapeutic Research Institute
6-1, Okubo 1-chome
Kumamoto-shi, Kumamoto 860-8568 / JP
Former [1997/51]For all designated states
IATRON LABORATORIES, INC.
11-4 Higashi-Kanda 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101 / JP
For all designated states
Juridical Foundation, The Chemo-Sero-Therapeutic Research Institute
6-1, Okubo 1-chome
Kumamoto-shi, Kumamoto 860 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / KOHNO, Isao Iatron Laboratories, Inc.
11-4, Higashikanda 1-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 101 / JP
02 / ITOH, Yumiko Iatron Laboratories, Inc.
11-4, Higashikanda 1-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 101 / JP
03 / KUMETA, Kosuke
147-2, Yamaguchi, Gyokutomachi
Tamana-gun, Kumamoto 869-03 / JP
04 / KAMIKUBO, Yuichi
6-89-2, Hakenomiya 3-chome
Kumamoto-shi, Kumamoto 860 / US
05 / SOE, Gilbu Iatron Laboratories, Inc.
11-4, Higashikanda 1-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 101 / JP
 [2002/05]
Former [2000/28]01 / KOHNO, Isao Iatron Laboratories, Inc.
11-4, Higashikanda 1-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 101 / JP
02 / ITOH, Yumiko Iatron Laboratories, Inc.
11-4, Higashikanda 1-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 101 / JP
03 / KUMETA, Kosuke
147-2, Yamaguchi, Gyokutomachi
Tamana-gun, Kumamoto 869-03 / JP
04 / KAMIKUBO, Yuichi
6-89-2, Hakenomiya 3-chome
Kumamoto-shi, Kumamoto 860 / US
05 / 2OE, Gilbu Iatron Laboratories, Inc.
11-4, Higashikanda 1-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 101 / JP
Former [1997/51]01 / KOHNO, Isao Iatron Laboratories, Inc.
11-4, Higashikanda 1-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 101 / JP
02 / ITOH, Yumiko Iatron Laboratories, Inc.
11-4, Higashikanda 1-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 101 / JP
03 / KUMETA, Kosuke 147-2, Yamaguchi Gyokutomachi
Tamana-gun
Kumamoto 869-03 / JP
04 / KAMIKUBO, Yuichi
6-89-2, Hakenomiya 3-chome Kumamoto-shi
Kumamoto 860 / US
05 / 2OE, Gilbu Iatron Laboratories, Inc.
11-4, Higashikanda 1-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 101 / JP
Representative(s)Cohausz & Florack
Patent- & Rechtsanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Bleichstrasse 14
40211 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [1997/51]Cohausz & Florack
Patentanwälte Kanzlerstrasse 8a
40472 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date96943313.526.12.1996
[1997/51]
WO1996JP03832
Priority number, dateJP1995033922926.12.1995         Original published format: JP 33922995
[1997/51]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9723509
Date:03.07.1997
Language:EN
[1997/29]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0812859
Date:17.12.1997
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.07.1997
[1997/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0812859
Date:13.02.2002
Language:EN
[2002/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP03.07.1997
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:C07K16/36, C12P21/08, C12N15/06, C12N5/18, G01N33/53, G01N33/577, C07K16/40, C07K16/38
[2000/16]
Former International [1997/51]C07K16/36, C12P21/08, C12N15/06, C12N5/18, G01N33/53, G01N33/577
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [1997/51]
TitleGerman:MONOKLONALER ANTIKÖRPER GEGEN DEN KOMPLEX AUS FAKTOR XA UND DEM INHIBITOR FÜR DEN GEWEBEFAKTOR (XA. TFPI)[1997/51]
English:ANTIFACTOR Xa-TISSUE FACTOR PATHWAY INHIBITOR COMPLEX MONOCLONAL ANTIBODY AND USE OF THE SAME[1997/51]
French:ANTICORPS MONOCLONAL, ANTI COMPLEXE "Xa . TFPI" ET SON UTILISATION[1997/51]
Entry into regional phase23.08.1997Translation filed 
23.08.1997National basic fee paid 
23.08.1997Search fee paid 
23.08.1997Designation fee(s) paid 
23.08.1997Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.08.1997Examination requested  [1997/51]
17.11.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.01.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.03.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
11.07.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.08.2001Fee for grant paid
18.08.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.11.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2003/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.12.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
26.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
20.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
30.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[A]  GIRARD T J ET AL, "FUNCTIONAL SIGNIFICANCE OF THE KUNITZ-TYPE INHIBITORY DOMAINS OF LIPOPROTEIN-ASSOCIATED COAGULATION INHIBITOR", NATURE,GB,MACMILLAN JOURNALS LTD. LONDON, (198904), vol. 338, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 518 - 520, XP000857349 [A] 1-5 * page 518 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/338518a0
 [A]  BROZE JR G J ET AL, "REGULATION OF COAGULATION BY A MULTIVALENT KUNITZ-TYPE INHIBITOR", BIOCHEMISTRY,US,AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. EASTON, PA, (19900821), vol. 29, no. 33, ISSN 0006-2960, pages 7539 - 7546, XP000268583 [A] 1-5 * page 7541, column 2, paragraph 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bi00485a001
 [A]  GIRARD T J ET AL, "INHIBITION OF FACTOR VIIA-TISSUE FACTOR COAGULATION ACTIVITY BY A HYBRID PROTEIN", SCIENCE,US,AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF SCIENCE,, (19900615), vol. 248, no. 4961, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 1421 - 1424, XP000253643 [A] 1-5 * page 248, paragraph 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1972598
 [PA]  GOUIN-THIBAULT I ET AL, "PROBABLE REGULATION OF FACTOR VIIa-TISSUE FACTOR AND PROTHROMBINASE BY FACTOR Xa-TFPI AND TFPI IN VIVO", BRITISH JOURNAL OF HAEMATOLOGY, vol. 95, no. 4, pages 738- - 746, XP000872775 [PA] 1-5 * page 739, paragraph 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1365-2141.1996.d01-1963.x
International search[A]  - J. BIOCHEM., Vol. 118, No. 1, (1995), "An Anti-Tissue Factor Pathway Inhibitor Monoclonal Antibody ...", pages 178-182.,
 [A]  - J. BIOCHEM., Vol. 115, No. 4, (1994), "Amino Acid Sequence and Inhibitory Activity ...", pages 708-714.,