blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0868361

EP0868361 - Quick-on fuel cap [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1998/41]QUICK-ON FUEL CAP
[2002/12]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  31.01.2003
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip11.01.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 13.02.2008  [2008/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
STANT MANUFACTURING INC.
1620 Columbia Avenue
Connersville, IN 47331-1696 / US
[1998/41]
Inventor(s)01 / HARRIS, Robert, S.
R.R. 3, Box 177
Connersville, IN 47331 / US
02 / GRIFFIN, Jeffery
Route 6, Box 414A
Connersville, IN 47331 / US
[1998/41]
Representative(s)Wright, Howard Hugh Burnby, et al
Withers & Rogers LLP
2 London Bridge
London SE1 9RA / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/41]Wright, Howard Hugh Burnby, et al
Withers & Rogers, 4 Dyer's Buildings
Holborn, London EC1N 2JT / GB
Application number, filing date96943663.304.12.1996
[1998/41]
WO1996US19589
Priority number, dateUS1995056686804.12.1995         Original published format: US 566868
[1998/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9720747
Date:12.06.1997
Language:EN
[1997/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0868361
Date:07.10.1998
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.06.1997 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1998/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0868361
Date:27.03.2002
Language:EN
[2002/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US12.06.1997
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.04.1999
ClassificationIPC:B65D51/16
[1998/41]
CPC:
B60K15/0406 (EP,US); Y10S220/33 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [1998/41]
TitleGerman:Schnellverschluss für ein Kraftstofftank[2001/32]
English:Quick-on fuel cap[2002/12]
French:Bouchon de réservoir de carburant à fremeture rapide[2002/12]
Former [1998/41]HEIZUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR KRAFTFAHRZEUGE UNTER VERWENDUNG DES KÜHLFLÜSSIGKEITSKREISLAUFES
Former [1998/41]QUICK-ON FUEL CAP
Former [1998/41]BOUCHON DE RESERVOIR DE CARBURANT A FERMETURE RAPIDE
Entry into regional phase01.07.1998National basic fee paid 
01.07.1998Search fee paid 
01.07.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
01.07.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.06.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
01.07.1998Examination requested  [1998/41]
15.09.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.03.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.09.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.03.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.06.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
25.09.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.12.2001Fee for grant paid
14.12.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)30.12.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2003/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
19.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
20.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
31.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT27.03.2002
IT27.03.2002
ES25.09.2002
[2008/07]
Former [2004/04]AT27.03.2002
ES25.09.2002
Former [2003/09]AT27.03.2002
Documents cited:Search[A]US5167340  (SHAW JAMES R [US]) [A] 5,10* column A; figure - *;
 [X]US5385256  (BROWN DAVID M [US]) [X] 1,10 * column A; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]WO9530592  (STANT MFG CO [US]) [A] 1,2,10,11,14 * abstract *
International search[A]US3893487  (ENGELKING FREDERICK S);
 [X]US4102472  (SLOAN JR PAUL H);
 [A]US4690293  (URANISHI KOUJI [JP], et al);
 [X]US4887733  (HARRIS ROBERT S [US]);
 [Y]US5269431  (SAKATA SHINJI [JP], et al);
 [XP]US5480055  (HARRIS ROBERT S [US], et al);
 [XP]US5540347  (GRIFFIN JEFFERY [US])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.