Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0868551

EP0868551 - THERMOPLASTIC THREE-DIMENSIONAL FIBER NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.06.2001
Database last updated on 16.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip08.03.2002Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IE
published on 24.04.2002  [2002/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HOECHST CELANESE CORPORATION
Route 202-206 North, P.O. Box 2500
Somerville, NJ 08876-1258 / US
[1998/41]
Inventor(s)01 / KIM, Dai, W.
44 Huron Drive
Chatham, NJ 07928 / US
02 / HAAS, Joseph, S., W.
3615 Park Road
Charlotte, NC 28209 / US
03 / BESSEY, William, E.
7159 Windyrush Road
Charlotte, NC 28226 / US
[1998/41]
Representative(s)dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/41]von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem. , et al
Patentanwälte, von Kreisler-Selting-Werner, Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 (Deichmannhaus)
50667 Köln / DE
Application number, filing date96943683.110.12.1996
[1998/41]
WO1996US19686
Priority number, dateUS1995057765522.12.1995         Original published format: US 577655
[1998/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9724916
Date:17.07.1997
Language:EN
[1997/31]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0868551
Date:07.10.1998
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.07.1997
[1998/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0868551
Date:02.08.2000
Language:EN
[2000/31]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.08.1997
ClassificationInternational:D04H1/00
[1998/41]
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT,   SE [1998/41]
TitleGerman:DREIDIMENSIONALES THERMOPLASTISCHES FASERNETZWERK[1998/41]
English:THERMOPLASTIC THREE-DIMENSIONAL FIBER NETWORK[1998/41]
French:RESEAU TRIDIMENSIONNEL DE FIBRES THERMOPLASTIQUES[1998/41]
Entry into regional phase06.06.1998National basic fee paid 
06.06.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
06.06.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.07.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
06.06.1998Examination requested  [1998/41]
15.07.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
08.10.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.12.1999Fee for grant paid
01.12.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.05.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.04.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
09.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.199803   M06   Fee paid on   14.04.1999
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT02.08.2000
SE02.11.2000
IE11.12.2000
[2002/17]
Former [2001/27]AT02.08.2000
SE02.11.2000
Former [2001/17]AT02.08.2000
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0469558  (HOECHST AG [DE]) [A] 1-32 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0409120  (HOECHST AG [DE]) [A] 1-32 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0559969  (SOMMER SA [FR]) [A] 1-32 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5296289  (COLLINS LOREN M [US]) [A] 1-32 * the whole document *;
 [A]JPH07324272
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960430), vol. 096, no. 004, [A] 1,15 * abstract *