Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0868193

EP0868193 - PROCESS FOR GENTLY STERILISING PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.12.2000
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip17.02.2006Change - lapse in a contracting state
Updated state(s): FR
published on 05.04.2006  [2006/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bionorica Arzneimittel GmbH
Kerschensteiner Strasse 11-15
92318 Neumarkt / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/10]For all designated states
Bionorica Arzneimittel HmbH
Kerschensteiner Strasse 11-15
92318 Neumarkt / DE
Former [1998/41]For all designated states
Plantamed Arzneimittel GmbH
Kerschensteiner Strasse 11-15
92318 Neumarkt / DE
Inventor(s)01 / JOSEPH, Heinz, Walter
Marie-Juchacz-Weg 17
D-71522 Backnang / DE
[1998/41]
Representative(s)Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt
Partnerschaft mbB
Joseph-Wild-Strasse 20
81829 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/41]Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx
Stuntzstrasse 16
81677 München / DE
Application number, filing date96943940.512.12.1996
[1998/41]
WO1996EP05578
Priority number, dateDE199514797321.12.1995         Original published format: DE 19547973
[1998/41]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9723232
Date:03.07.1997
Language:DE
[1997/29]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0868193
Date:07.10.1998
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.07.1997
[1998/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0868193
Date:09.02.2000
Language:DE
[2000/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.07.1997
ClassificationInternational:A61K35/78, F26B7/00, C11B9/02
[1998/41]
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   DK,   FR,   GB,   IE,   LI,   NL,   SE [1998/41]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR SCHONENDEN KEIMREDUZIERUNG VON PHARMAZEUTISCHEN ZUBEREITUNGEN[1998/41]
English:PROCESS FOR GENTLY STERILISING PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS[1998/41]
French:PROCEDE POUR STERILISER AVEC MENAGEMENT DES COMPOSITIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES[1998/41]
Entry into regional phase20.07.1998National basic fee paid 
20.07.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
20.07.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.07.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
20.07.1998Examination requested  [1998/41]
22.01.1999Request for accelerated examination filed
09.02.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
09.02.1999Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
08.06.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.08.1999Fee for grant paid
17.08.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.11.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
30.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR09.02.2000
GB09.02.2000
NL09.02.2000
[2006/14]
Former [2003/09]GB09.02.2000
NL09.02.2000
FR07.07.2000
Former [2001/17]GB09.02.2000
IE09.02.2000
FR07.07.2000
Former [2001/16]GB09.02.2000
FR07.07.2000
Former [2001/12]GB09.02.2000
Cited inInternational search[E]EP0753306  (PLANTAMED ARZNEIMITTEL GMBH [DE]) [E] 1 * page 2, line 43 - page 3, line 14 *;
 [A]EP0435302  (BLAIZAT CLAUDE [FR]);
 [A]HU210015
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 96, no. 24, Database accession no. 96-233025, XP002029962 & HU210015 B 19950728 (SZARVADY B) [A] * abstract *