Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0876433

EP0876433 - MILLED SILICATES AND SILICAS USED IN INK JET PRINTING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.11.2000
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip24.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 10.01.2001 [2001/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Degussa GmbH
60287 Frankfurt am Main / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/36]For all designated states
Degussa-Hüls Aktiengesellschaft
60287 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Former [1999/26]For all designated states
Degussa-Hüls Aktiengesellschaft
45764 Marl / DE
Former [1998/46]For all designated states
Degussa Aktiengesellschaft
Weissfrauenstrasse 9
60311 Frankfurt / DE
Inventor(s)01 / DARSILLO, Michael, S.
2702 Robenson Park Drive
Champaign, IL 61821 / US
02 / ALLEN, Sturgis, Gregg
1148 Kirkwall Drive
Copley, OH 44321 / US
[1999/25]
Former [1998/46]01 / DARSILLO, Michael, S.
1010 Partridge Drive
Wadsworth, OH 44281 / US
02 / ALLEN, Sturgis, Gregg
1148 Kirkwall Drive
Copley, OH 44321 / US
Application number, filing date96943989.218.12.1996
[1998/46]
WO1996EP05674
Priority number, dateUS19950008882P19.12.1995         Original published format: US 8882 P
[1998/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9722670
Date:26.06.1997
Language:EN
[1997/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0876433
Date:11.11.1998
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.06.1997
[1998/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0876433
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.06.1997
ClassificationInternational:C09C1/30, C09C1/40, B41M5/00
[1998/46]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1998/46]
TitleGerman:GEMAHLENE SILIKATE UND KIESELSÄUREN FÜR TINTENSTRAHLDRUCK[1998/46]
English:MILLED SILICATES AND SILICAS USED IN INK JET PRINTING[1998/46]
French:SILICATES ET SILICES BROYES UTILISES DANS L'IMPRESSION PAR JET D'ENCRE[1998/46]
Entry into regional phase12.05.1998National basic fee paid 
12.05.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
12.05.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.06.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
12.05.1998Examination requested  [1998/46]
05.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
01.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.10.1999Fee for grant paid
05.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
12.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[Y]EP0637616  (DEGUSSA) [Y] 1-6,8,12 * page 6, lines 35-37; claims 1,16 *;
 [Y]JPH02136279  ;
 [A]EP0631880  (FELIX SCHOELLER JR. FOTO- UND SPEZIALPAPIERE) [A] 8,10,12 * claims 1,10,11 *;
 [PA]JPH0852934  ;
 [A]US4510254  (H.H. MORRIS ET AL.) [A] 1-4 * column 5, paragraph 1 *;
 [A]US4915923  (MASAHIDE OGAWA ET AL.) [A] 8,10,12 * column 5, paragraph L - column 6, paragraph 1; claim 1 *
 [Y]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 90, no. 27, Database accession no. 90-205574, XP002029851 & JPH02136279 A 19900524 (OJI PAPER) [Y] 1-6,8,12 * abstract *
 [PA]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 96, no. 18, Database accession no. 96-175333, XP002029852 & JPH0852934 A 19960227 (CANON) [PA] 8,10,12 * abstract *