Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0871383

EP0871383 - DEVICE FOR ADJUSTING THE INCLINATION OF THE BACK-REST RELATIVE TO THE SEATING PORTION IN CHAIRS IN GENERAL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.02.2001
Database last updated on 19.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.02.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 04.04.2001 [2001/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Imarc S.p.A.
Via Meucci 21
36028 Rossano Veneto / IT
[2000/02]
Former [1998/43]For all designated states
IMARC S.R.L.
Via Meucci 21
36028 Rossano Veneto / IT
Inventor(s)01 / GORGI, Claudio
Via Meucci, 21
I-36028 Rossano Veneto / IT
02 / TAVERNA, Claudio
Via Meucci, 21
I-36028 Rossano Veneto / IT
[1998/43]
Representative(s)Piovesana, Paolo
Via F. Baracca, 5/a
30173 Venezia-Mestre / IT
[N/P]
Former [1998/43]Piovesana, Paolo
Corso del Popolo, 70
30172 Venezia-Mestre / IT
Application number, filing date96944053.620.12.1996
[1998/43]
WO1996EP05795
Priority number, dateIT1995VE0005122.12.1995         Original published format: IT VE950051
[1998/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9723152
Date:03.07.1997
Language:EN
[1997/29]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0871383
Date:21.10.1998
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.07.1997
[1998/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0871383
Date:19.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.07.1997
ClassificationInternational:A47C1/024, A47C7/44
[1998/43]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   GB,   IT [1998/43]
TitleGerman:VERSTELLVORRICHTUNG FÜR DIE NEIGUNG EINER RÜCKENSTÜTZE BEZÜGLICH EINES SITZTEILS BEI STÜHLEN[1998/43]
English:DEVICE FOR ADJUSTING THE INCLINATION OF THE BACK-REST RELATIVE TO THE SEATING PORTION IN CHAIRS IN GENERAL[1998/43]
French:DISPOSITIF POUR REGLER L'INCLINAISON D'UN DOSSIER DE CHAISE PAR RAPPORT AU SIEGE[1998/43]
Entry into regional phase19.06.1998National basic fee paid 
19.06.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
08.06.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.06.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
08.06.1998Examination requested  [1998/43]
29.12.1998Request for accelerated examination filed
18.06.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
18.06.1999Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
21.10.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.12.1999Fee for grant paid
06.12.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.12.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
22.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[Y]GB1261312  (DRABERT SOEHNE [DE]) [Y] 1,2,4,6,7 * the whole document *;
 [YA]GB2119639  (RING MEKANIKK AS) [Y] 1,2,4,6,7 * the whole document * [A] 5;
 [A]FR2439565  (DRABERT SOEHNE [DE]) [A] 3,8 * the whole document *;
 [A]US3042448  (HAMILTON EARL F) [A] 9-11 * figures 3-7 *