blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0866990 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0866990



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 125
09.01.2002 Closing of application Search / examination 3
31.07.2001 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
15.01.2001 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
15.01.2001 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
04.11.2000 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
15.09.2000 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
14.09.2000 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
14.09.2000 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
14.09.2000 European search report Search / examination 1
21.09.1998 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
21.09.1998 Priority document Search / examination 24
19.08.1998 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
12.08.1998 Invitation to file priority document Search / examination 1
25.02.1998 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 2
04.02.1998 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 3
09.01.1998 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 5
09.01.1998 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
09.01.1998 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
31.07.1997 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
03.07.1997 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 5
01.07.1997 Annex Search / examination 30
19.06.1997 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
19.06.1997 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 28