Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0866990

EP0866990 - TUNABLE OPTICAL COUPLER USING PHOTOSENSITIVE GLASS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  11.01.2002
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.01.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 27.02.2002  [2002/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Corning Incorporated
1 Riverfront Plaza
Corning, NY 14831 / US
[N/P]
Former [1998/40]For all designated states
CORNING INCORPORATED
1 Riverfront Plaza
Corning, N.Y. 14831 / US
Inventor(s)01 / COOK, Thomas, A.
399B Hornby Road
Corning, NY 14830 / US
02 / MODAVIS, Robert, A.
14 Taylor Street
Painted Post, NY 14870 / US
[1998/40]
Representative(s)Boon, Graham Anthony
Elkington and Fife LLP
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks
Kent TN13 1XR / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/40]Boon, Graham Anthony
Elkington and Fife, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
Application number, filing date96944334.006.12.1996
[1998/40]
WO1996US19798
Priority number, dateUS1995057201614.12.1995         Original published format: US 572016
[1998/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9722024
Date:19.06.1997
Language:EN
[1997/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0866990
Date:30.09.1998
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.06.1997
[1998/40]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US19.06.1997
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.09.2000
ClassificationInternational:G02B6/18, G02B6/293
[2000/44]
Former International [1998/40]G02B6/18
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT,   NL,   SE [1998/40]
TitleGerman:ABSTIMMBARER OPTISCHER KOPPLER MIT PHOTOEMPFINDLICHEM GLAS[1998/40]
English:TUNABLE OPTICAL COUPLER USING PHOTOSENSITIVE GLASS[1998/40]
French:COUPLEUR OPTIQUE ACCORDABLE UTILISANT DU VERRE PHOTOSENSIBLE[1998/40]
Entry into regional phase07.01.1998National basic fee paid 
07.01.1998Search fee paid 
07.01.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
07.01.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.02.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
09.01.1998Examination requested  [1998/40]
15.01.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.05.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/09]
31.07.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2002/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.12.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
06.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
07.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[X]US5459801  (SNITZER ELIAS [US]) [X] 1-12 * abstract *;
 [X]EP0503808  (SPERRY MARINE INC [US]) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * column 3, line 43 - line 57 * * column 4, line 43 - column 5, line 3 *;
 [X]DE4335428  (UNIV DRESDEN TECH [DE]) [X] 1-12 * abstract * * page 3, line 3 - line 16 *;
 [X]US5440656  (UEKI KEN [JP], et al) [X] 1-12 * abstract * * column 5, line 38 - line 44 * * column 6, line 5 - line 9 *;
 [E]US5652819  (ORAZI RICHARD J [US]) [E] 1-12 * the whole document *
International search[Y]US4474427  (HILL KENNETH O [CA], et al);
 [Y]US4341441  (LIGHTY PAUL E, et al);
 [Y]US4948217  (KECK DONALD B [US], et al)