Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0868496

EP0868496 - ADHESIVE TAPE AND METHOD OF MAKING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  15.06.2007
Database last updated on 15.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip12.03.2010Change - representativepublished on 14.04.2010  [2010/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY
3M Center, P.O. Box 33427
St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
[N/P]
Former [1998/41]For all designated states
MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY
3M Center, P.O. Box 33427
St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US
Inventor(s)01 / DEEB, Gerald, S.
P.O. Box 33427
Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
02 / KRUEGER, Dennis, L.
P.O. Box 33427
Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
03 / MENIZIES, Robert, H.
P.O. Box 33427
Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
04 / MORRIS, Herbert, H.
P.O. Box 33427
Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
05 / HYDE, Patrick, D.
P.O. Box 33427
Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
06 / LAU, Felix, P.
P.O. Box 33427
Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
07 / PYUN, Eumi
P.O. Box 33427
Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
08 / TUCKER, Pamela, S.
P.O. Box 33427
Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
09 / WONG, Roy
P.O. Box 33427
Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
[1998/41]
Representative(s)dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
[N/P]
Former [2010/15]von Kreisler Selting Werner
Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
Former [1998/41]Werner, Hans-Karsten, Dr.Dipl.-Chem. , et al
Patentanwälte Von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41
50462 Köln / DE
Application number, filing date96945229.120.12.1996
[1998/41]
WO1996US20298
Priority number, dateUS1995057785522.12.1995         Original published format: US 577855
[1998/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9724222
Date:10.07.1997
Language:EN
[1997/30]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0868496
Date:07.10.1998
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.07.1997
[1998/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.08.1997
ClassificationInternational:C09J7/04, C09J7/02
[1998/41]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [1998/41]
TitleGerman:KLEBEBAND UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN[1998/41]
English:ADHESIVE TAPE AND METHOD OF MAKING[1998/41]
French:BANDE ADHESIVE ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION[1998/41]
Entry into regional phase16.06.1998National basic fee paid 
16.06.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
16.06.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.06.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
16.06.1998Examination requested  [1998/41]
21.01.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.09.1999Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
30.10.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.05.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03)
09.08.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.05.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
31.10.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.09.2002Application refused, date of legal effect [2003/46]
07.11.2002Date of oral proceedings
11.12.2002Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2003/46]
11.12.2002Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2007/29]
11.12.2002Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
14.08.2003Application refused, date of legal effect [2007/29]
Appeal following examination11.02.2003Appeal received No.  T0309/03
30.07.2003Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant inadmissible
Request for further processing for:30.10.1999Request for further processing filed
30.10.1999Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
18.11.1999Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.12.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
06.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
07.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
31.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
23.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[XP]US5547766  (GOBRAN RAMSIS) [XP] 1,3-5,8 * column 1, line 55 - column 2, line 9 * * claim - *;
 WO9705207  [ ] (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG);
 [A]US3853598  (RAGUSE R) [A] 1-3,5,8,16 * column 3, line 67 - column 4, line 52 * * claim - *;
 [A]JPH05247422  ;
 [A]US5246773  (MAMISH ABBOUD L) [A] 1,50 * claim - *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940106), vol. 018, no. 004, Database accession no. (C - 1149), & JP05247422 A 19930924 (SEKISUI CHEM CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract *