Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0868496 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0868496



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 348
11.03.2010 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Search / examination 1
15.10.2003 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
25.09.2003 Closing of application Search / examination 3
04.08.2003 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 10
09.07.2003 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
10.05.2003 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 1
10.05.2003 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
08.05.2003 F3028 Inadmissibility of the appeal: non-submission of the statement of grounds Appeal 1
08.04.2003 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
07.04.2003 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
24.03.2003 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (ex parte) Appeal 1
27.02.2003 Processing of an appeal Appeal 1
14.02.2003 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
13.02.2003 Request for correction of errors in filed documents Appeal 3
12.02.2003 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
11.02.2003 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
14.12.2002 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
11.12.2002 Annex Search / examination 4
11.12.2002 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
11.12.2002 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
11.12.2002 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 6
11.12.2002 Means of redress Search / examination 1
11.12.2002 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
11.12.2002 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
12.11.2002 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
12.11.2002 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
08.10.2002 Claims Search / examination 4
08.10.2002 Claims Search / examination 4
08.10.2002 Claims Search / examination 4
08.10.2002 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 3
07.10.2002 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 15
12.07.2002 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
12.07.2002 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
09.07.2002 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
09.07.2002 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
24.04.2002 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
20.12.2001 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
31.10.2001 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
12.09.2001 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
05.09.2001 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
04.09.2001 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
10.07.2001 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
04.07.2001 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
03.07.2001 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
04.05.2001 Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) Search / examination 1
04.05.2001 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
10.08.2000 Claims Search / examination 6
10.08.2000 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
09.08.2000 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 10
10.05.2000 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
18.11.1999 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
30.10.1999 Claims Search / examination 8
30.10.1999 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
01.09.1999 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
27.07.1999 Refusal of request for extension of time limit Search / examination 1
17.07.1999 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
31.05.1999 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
20.05.1999 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
21.01.1999 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
26.08.1998 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
10.07.1998 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 9
26.06.1998 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
16.06.1998 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
18.08.1997 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
15.08.1997 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 6
10.07.1997 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 82
10.07.1997 Priority document Search / examination 88