Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0967993

EP0967993 - ANTI-COCAINE VACCINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  01.12.2006
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip01.12.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 03.01.2007  [2007/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE SCRIPPS RESEARCH INSTITUTE
10550 North Torrey Pines Road
La Jolla, CA 92037 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
The Scripps Research Institute
10550 North Torrey Pines Road
La Jolla, CA 92037 / US
Inventor(s)01 / WIRSCHING, Peter
P.O. Box 2228
Del Mar, CA 92014 / US
02 / JANDA, Kim, D.
3181 Erie Street
San Diego, CA 92112 / US
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Hedley, Nicholas James Matthew , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lancon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2004/30]Hedley, Nicholas James Matthew , et al
Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Former [2000/01]Kiddle, Simon John , et al
Mewburn Ellis, York House, 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Application number, filing date96945392.716.12.1996
[2000/01]
WO1996US19982
Priority number, dateUS1995057284914.12.1995         Original published format: US 572849
[2000/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9721451
Date:19.06.1997
Language:EN
[1997/26]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0967993
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.06.1997
[2000/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US07.08.1997
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.03.2001
ClassificationInternational:A61K39/395, C07K14/765, C07K14/77, C07K16/44, C12P21/08, C07D451/12
[2001/16]
Former International [2000/01]A61K39/395, C07K14/765, C07K14/77, C07K16/44, C12P21/08
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2000/01]
TitleGerman:ANTI-KOKAINE VAKZINE[2000/01]
English:ANTI-COCAINE VACCINE[2000/01]
French:VACCIN ANTI-COCAINE[2000/01]
Entry into regional phase03.07.1998National basic fee paid 
03.07.1998Search fee paid 
03.07.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
03.07.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.07.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
03.07.1998Examination requested  [2000/01]
05.08.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.05.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.02.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.07.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.07.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2007/01]
04.08.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2007/01]
Request for further processing for:26.05.2004Request for further processing filed
27.05.2004Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
14.06.2004Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.12.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
09.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
13.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
13.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
12.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
29.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 08
14.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.200510   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search   [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[Y]US5233042  ;
 [Y]US5463028  ;
 [Y]US3966744
 [Y]  - CHANDRAKUMAR N S, ET AL., "PHENYLPHOSPHONATE MONOESTER ANALOGS OF COCAINE POTENTIAL HAPTENS FOR THE GENERATION OF CATALYTIC ANTIBODIES", Bioorganic & Medicinal Chemistry Letters, Pergamon, AMSTERDAM, NL, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19930101), vol. 03, no. 02, doi:10.1016/S0960-894X(01)80899-4, ISSN 0960-894X, pages 309 - 312, XP002943881

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0960-894X(01)80899-4
 [XP]  - Sakurai, M. Wirsching, P. Janda, K.D., "Design and Synthesis of a Cocaine-Diamide Hapten for Vaccine Development", Tetrahedron Letters, Pergamon, GB, GB, (19960729), vol. 37, no. 31, doi:10.1016/0040-4039(96)01170-7, ISSN 0040-4039, pages 5479 - 5482, XP004029429

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0040-4039(96)01170-7
 [X]  - CARRERA M. R. A., ET AL., "SUPPRESSION OF PSYCHOACTIVE EFFECTS OF COCAINE BY ACTIVE IMMUNIZATION.", NATURE, Nature Publishing Group, United Kingdom, United Kingdom, (19951214), vol. 378., no. 6558, doi:10.1038/378727a0, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 727 - 730., XP000946580

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/378727a0
 [YP]  - YANG G, ET AL., "ANTI-COCAINE CATALYTIC ANTIBODIES: A SYNTHETIC APPROACH TO IMPROVEDANTIBODY DIVERSITY", Journal of the American Chemical Society, American Chemical Society, US, US, (19960101), vol. 118, no. 25, doi:10.1021/ja953077+, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 5881 - 5890, XP002943817

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja953077+
 [YP]  - BERKMAN C E, UNDERINER G E, CASHMAN J R, "SYNTHESIS OF AN IMMUNOGENIC TEMPLATE FOR THE GENERATION OF CATALYTIC ANTIBODIES FOR (-)-COCAINE HYDROLYSIS", The Journal of Organic Chemistry, American Chemical Society, US, US, (19960101), vol. 61, doi:10.1021/jo960522q, ISSN 0022-3263, pages 5686 - 5689, XP002943816

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo960522q
 [Y]  - BASMADJIAN G P, ET AL., "GENERATION OF POLYCLONAL CATALYTIC ANTIBODIES AGAINST COCAINE USING TRANSITION STATE ANALOGS OF COCAINE CONJUGATED TO DIPHTHERIA TOXOID", Chemical and Pharmaceutical Bulletin, Pharmaceutical Society of Japan, JP, JP, (19951101), vol. 43, no. 11, ISSN 0009-2363, pages 1902 - 1911, XP000992938
 [Y]  - LANDRY D. W., ET AL., "ANTIBODY-CATALYZED DEGRADATION OT COCAINE.", Science, American Association for the Advancement of Science, US, US, (19930101), vol. 259., no. 5103., doi:10.1126/science.8456315, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 1899 - 1901., XP000887211

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.8456315
 [Y]  - BAGASRA O, ET AL., "A POTENTIAL VACCINE FOR COCAINE ABUSE PROPHYLAXIS", IMMUNOPHARMACOLOGY., ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS BV., XX, XX, (19920101), vol. 23, doi:10.1016/0162-3109(92)90023-6, ISSN 0162-3109, pages 173 - 179, XP002943882

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0162-3109(92)90023-6
 [Y]  - ERLANGER B. F., "THE PREPARATION OF ANTIGENIC HAPTEN-CARRIER CONJUGATES: A SURVEY.", METHODS IN ENZYMOLOGY, ACADEMIC PRESS, US, US, (19800101), vol. 70., doi:10.1016/S0076-6879(80)70043-5, ISSN 0076-6879, pages 85 - 104., XP002911374

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0076-6879(80)70043-5
 [Y]  - HILPERT R, ET AL., "BIOSENSOR TECHNOLOGY FOR THE DETECTION OF ILLEGAL DRUGS (II) ANTIBODY DEVELOPMENT AND DETECTION TECHNIQUES", Optomechatronic micro/nano devices and components III : 8 - 10 October 2007, Lausanne, Switzerland, SPIE, Bellingham, Wash., Bellingham, Wash., (19940101), vol. 2276, doi:10.1117/12.189163, ISBN 978-1-62841-730-2, pages 128 - 138, XP002943813

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.189163