Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0972294

EP0972294 - ELECTRODE MATERIALS FROM HYDROUS METAL AND/OR HYDROUS MIXED METAL OXIDES AND METHOD OF PREPARING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  22.10.2004
Database last updated on 15.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip22.10.2004Refusal of applicationpublished on 08.12.2004  [2004/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The United States of America as represented by The Secretary of the Army
Pentagon
Washington, DC 20310 / US
[2000/03]
Inventor(s)01 / ZHENG, Jian-Ping
2470 Buckhead Road
Auburn, Alabana 36836 / US
02 / JOW, T., Richard
101 Ormont Road
Chatham, NJ 07928 / US
[2000/19]
Former [2000/03]01 / ZHENG, Jian-Ping
Apartment 195, 61 Country Club Road
Eatontown, NJ 07724 / US
02 / JOW, T., Richard
101 Ormont Road
Chatham, NJ 07928 / US
Representative(s)Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Grillparzerstrasse 14
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/03]Viering, Jentschura & Partner
Postfach 22 14 43
80504 München / DE
Application number, filing date96945808.219.12.1996
[2000/03]
WO1996US20914
Priority number, dateUS1996067822211.07.1996         Original published format: US 678222
[2000/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9802891
Date:22.01.1998
Language:EN
[1998/03]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0972294
Date:19.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.01.1998
[2000/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US22.01.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:H01G9/00, H01G9/04, H01M4/02, H01M4/36, H01M4/52, H01M4/58, H01M4/60, H01M4/62, H01M4/86, H01M4/90, H01M4/96
[2000/03]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/03]
TitleGerman:ELEKTRODENMATERIALEN AUS HYDRATIERTEM METALL UND/ODER HYDRATIERTEN GEMISCHTEN METALLOXIDEN UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG[2000/03]
English:ELECTRODE MATERIALS FROM HYDROUS METAL AND/OR HYDROUS MIXED METAL OXIDES AND METHOD OF PREPARING THE SAME[2000/03]
French:MATERIAUX D'ELECTRODES A BASE D'OXYDES METALLIQUES HYDRIQUES ET/OU D'OXYDES METALLIQUES MIXTES HYDRIQUES ET PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DE CES MATERIAUX[2000/03]
Entry into regional phase10.02.1999National basic fee paid 
10.02.1999Search fee paid 
10.02.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
10.02.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.02.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
10.02.1999Examination requested  [2000/03]
27.01.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.06.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.06.2004Date of oral proceedings
09.07.2004Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2004/50]
09.07.2004Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
19.07.2004Application refused, date of legal effect [2004/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.02.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
30.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
22.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
28.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
31.01.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
31.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.200207   M06   Fee paid on   31.01.2003
Documents cited:Search   [] - No further relevant documents disclosed,
International search[X]  - SAN FRANCISCO CONFERENCE, April 1995, ZHENG et al., "A New Charge Storage Mechanism for Electrochemical Capacitors and Charge Storage Density vs. Crystalline Structure of Metal Oxides".,
 [X]  - JOURNAL OF THE ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY, August 1995, Vol. 142, No. 8, ZHENG et al., "Hydrous Ruthenium Oxide as an Electrode Material for Electrochemical Capacitors".,