Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0892830

EP0892830 - MULTILAYERED SHEET, PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  20.02.2015
Database last updated on 28.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip31.07.2015Change - lapse in a contracting state
State(s) deleted from list of lapses: NL
published on 02.09.2015  [2015/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Coveris Flexibles Deutschland GmbH
Anton-Böhlen-Str. 5
34414 Warburg / DE
[2014/32]
Former [2006/46]For all designated states
Kobusch-Sengewald GmbH
34414 Warburg / DE
Former [2003/26]For all designated states
Kobusch-Sengewald GmbH & Co.KG
Anton-Böhlen-Str. 5
34414 Warburg / DE
Former [1999/04]For all designated states
Sengewald Verpackungen GmbH
Kreisstrasse 16
33790 Halle / DE
Inventor(s)01 / LANGE, Winfried
Dompfaffenstrasse 24
D-33335 Gütersloh / DE
[1999/04]
Representative(s)Neidl-Stippler, Cornelia
Neidl-Stippler
Patentanwaltskanzlei
Rauchstrasse 2
81679 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/49]Neidl-Stippler, Cornelia
Neidl-Stippler Patentanwaltskanzlei Rauchstrasse 2
81679 München / DE
Former [2003/42]Neidl-Stippler, Cornelia, Dr.
Patentanwältin, Rauchstrasse 2
81679 München / DE
Former [1999/04]Neidl-Stippler & Partner
Rauchstrasse 2
81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date96945824.923.10.1996
[1999/04]
WO1996DE02012
Priority number, dateDE19962005214U21.03.1996         Original published format: DE 29605214 U
DE1996104003829.09.1996         Original published format: DE 19640038
[1999/04]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9734951
Date:25.09.1997
Language:DE
[1997/41]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0892830
Date:27.01.1999
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.09.1997
[1999/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0892830
Date:13.08.2003
Language:DE
[2003/33]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP25.09.1997
ClassificationInternational:C08L23/10, B32B27/32
[1999/04]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [1999/04]
TitleGerman:MEHRLAGENFOLIE, VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG UND IHRE VERWENDUNG[1999/04]
English:MULTILAYERED SHEET, PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF AND USE THEREOF[1999/04]
French:FEUILLE MULTICOUCHE, SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION ET SON UTILISATION[1999/04]
Entry into regional phase30.09.1998National basic fee paid 
30.09.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
30.09.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.09.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
30.09.1998Examination requested  [1999/04]
04.08.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.12.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.10.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.11.2002Fee for grant paid
20.11.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  12.05.2004  07.09.2004  ADMISSIBLE
Fresenius Medical Care Deutschland GmbH
Frankfurter Strasse 6-8
66606 St. Wendel / DE
Opponent's representative
Mai Dörr Besier European Patent Attorneys
European Trademark Attorneys
Patentanwälte
Kreuzberger Ring 64
65205 Wiesbaden / DE
 02  13.05.2004  07.09.2004  ADMISSIBLE
PolyCine GmbH
Im Gewerbepark Klinkenthal 33
66578 Schiffweiler / DE
Opponent's representative
Isenbruck, Günter
Patentanwälte
Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB
Eastsite One
Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4
68163 Mannheim / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2012/11]
Opponent(s)01  12.05.2004  07.09.2004  ADMISSIBLE
Fresenius Medical Care Deutschland GmbH
Frankfurter Strasse 6-8
66606 St. Wendel / DE
Opponent's representative
Mai, Dörr, Besier
Patentanwälte
John-F.-Kennedy-Straße 4
65189 Wiesbaden / DE
 02  13.05.2004  07.09.2004  ADMISSIBLE
PolyCine GmbH
Im Gewerbepark Klinkenthal 33
66578 Schiffweiler / DE
Opponent's representative
Isenbruck, Günter
Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler LLP Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4
68163 Mannheim / DE
Former [2004/29]
Opponent(s)01  12.05.2004   
Fresenius Medical Care Deutschland GmbH
Frankfurter Strasse 6-8
66606 St. Wendel / DE
Opponent's representative
Luderschmidt, Schüler & Partner GbR
Patentanwälte, John-F.-Kennedy-Strasse 4
65189 Wiesbaden / DE
 02  13.05.2004   
PolyCine GmbH
Im Gewerbepark Klinkenthal 33
66578 Schiffweiler / DE
Opponent's representative
Isenbruck, Günter, Dr.
Isenbruck, Bösl, Hörschler, Wichmann, Huhn, Patentanwälte Theodor-Heuss-Anlage 12
68165 Mannheim / DE
Former [2004/28]
Opponent(s)01  13.05.2004   
PolyCine GmbH
Im Gewerbepark Klinkenthal 33
66578 Schiffweiler / DE
Opponent's representative
Isenbruck, Günter, Dr.
Isenbruck, Bösl, Hörschler, Wichmann, Huhn, Patentanwälte Theodor-Heuss-Anlage 12
68165 Mannheim / DE
10.09.2004Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
11.05.2005Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
10.10.2006Date of oral proceedings
09.11.2006Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
09.11.2006Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
29.06.2011Date of oral proceedings
14.07.2011Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
14.07.2011Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
17.07.2014Legal effect of revocation of patent [2015/13]
Appeal following opposition22.09.2011Appeal received No.  T2216/11
24.11.2011Statement of grounds filed
22.09.2011Appeal received No.  T2116/11
22.11.2011Statement of grounds filed
17.07.2014Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent
12.01.2007Appeal received No.  T0192/07
09.03.2007Statement of grounds filed
07.06.2010Result of appeal procedure: continuation of opposition procedure
07.06.2010Date of oral proceedings
15.06.2010Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
17.07.2014Date of oral proceedings
01.08.2014Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.10.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
29.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
31.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
31.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 06
22.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.200005   M06   Fee paid on   27.04.2001
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT23.10.2003
BE31.10.2003
CH31.10.2003
LI31.10.2003
DK13.11.2003
PT13.01.2004
[2015/36]
Former [2010/45]AT23.10.2003
BE31.10.2003
CH31.10.2003
LI31.10.2003
DK13.11.2003
PT13.01.2004
NL01.05.2010
Former [2005/13]AT23.10.2003
BE31.10.2003
CH31.10.2003
LI31.10.2003
DK13.11.2003
PT13.01.2004
Former [2005/01]BE31.10.2003
CH31.10.2003
LI31.10.2003
DK13.11.2003
PT13.01.2004
Former [2004/44]CH31.10.2003
LI31.10.2003
DK13.11.2003
PT13.01.2004
Former [2004/31]DK13.11.2003
PT13.01.2004
Former [2004/29]DK13.11.2003
Cited inInternational search[XA]US4778697  (GENSKE ROGER P ET AL) [X] 1,2,8,20,22,23 * column 2, lines 53-66 - column 3, lines 61-62; examples 15-22; claims 1,3,11,41,49,57,65,66 * * column 5, lines 64-66 * [A] 6;
 [YDA]WO9526177  (FRESENIUS AG ;KREISCHER THOMAS (DE); HEILMANN KLAUS (DE); NICOLA T) [YD] 1-3,6,8,11,14,20,22,23 * page 3, lines 17-18; example 1; claims 1,6,7,9,10,12 * * page 4, line 20 - page 5, paragraph 1 * [A] 9;
 [E]EP0739713  (FRESENIUS AG) [E] 1-3,8,12-23 * page 4, lines 27-29; example -; claims 1-4,7-17 *;
 [YA]EP0437856  (IDEMITSU PETROCHEMICAL CO) [Y] 1-3,6,8,11,14,20,22,23 * page 2, lines 7-8 - page 5, lines 12-52; figure 1; claims 1,6,8,11-13 * [A] 6;
 [A]EP0380145  (AMERICAN NATIONAL CAN CO) [A] 3,6,7 * column 6, lines 25-56 - column 11, line 47; figures 3,4; claims 1,4 *;
 [PX]EP0704482  (ALKOR GMBH) [PX] 1,7,9 * figure 6; example -; claims 1,4 *