Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0892830 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0892830



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1558
18.02.2015 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
14.02.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
14.02.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
14.02.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
13.02.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
12.02.2015 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
11.02.2015 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 17
21.08.2014 Letter which had not been notified Appeal 9
01.08.2014 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 10
15.07.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
15.07.2014 Claims Appeal 3
15.07.2014 Claims Appeal 3
15.07.2014 Claims Appeal 3
15.07.2014 Claims Appeal 3
15.07.2014 Claims Appeal 3
15.07.2014 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
15.07.2014 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
09.07.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
09.07.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
09.07.2014 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
09.07.2014 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
08.07.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
08.07.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
08.07.2014 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Appeal 2
04.07.2014 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 2
24.06.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
24.06.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
24.06.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
24.06.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
18.06.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
18.06.2014 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Appeal 5
18.06.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
18.06.2014 Request for change of name - applicant Appeal 1
17.06.2014 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 2
17.06.2014 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
17.06.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 11
17.06.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
13.06.2014 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 22
15.05.2014 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 11
15.05.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
15.05.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
07.05.2014 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Appeal 1
07.05.2014 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
06.05.2014 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 1
23.04.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
23.04.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
19.04.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
19.04.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
17.04.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
16.04.2014 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
15.04.2014 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
15.04.2014 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
15.04.2014 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
15.04.2014 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 2
15.04.2014 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 2
15.04.2014 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 2
10.04.2014 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
20.01.2014 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the opponent (Association) Appeal 1
17.09.2013 Request for change of opponent's representative Appeal 1
06.06.2012 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
30.05.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
30.05.2012 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
30.05.2012 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 7
30.05.2012 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
30.05.2012 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
30.05.2012 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
03.04.2012 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 3
30.03.2012 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
28.03.2012 Fax filed during the search and/or examination procedure Appeal 1
28.03.2012 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 1
09.02.2012 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
04.02.2012 Request concerning the applicant/representative Appeal 1
03.02.2012 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 1
03.02.2012 Request concerning the applicant/representative Appeal 1
02.02.2012 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 1
15.12.2011 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
06.12.2011 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
30.11.2011 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
30.11.2011 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
28.11.2011 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
28.11.2011 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 16
24.11.2011 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 17
23.11.2011 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
23.11.2011 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
23.11.2011 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
23.11.2011 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
23.11.2011 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 14
23.11.2011 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 11
23.11.2011 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 17
22.11.2011 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 54
07.10.2011 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 3
03.10.2011 Processing of an appeal Search / examination 2
23.09.2011 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
22.09.2011 Letter concerning fees and payments Appeal 2
22.09.2011 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
22.09.2011 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
04.08.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
25.07.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
22.07.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
21.07.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
21.07.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
20.07.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
14.07.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
14.07.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
14.07.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
14.07.2011 Annex Opposition 7
14.07.2011 Annex Opposition 7
14.07.2011 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 5
14.07.2011 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
14.07.2011 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 18
14.07.2011 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
14.07.2011 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
14.07.2011 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
14.07.2011 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
14.07.2011 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 2
14.07.2011 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
14.07.2011 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
27.06.2011 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
22.06.2011 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
07.06.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.06.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.06.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
01.06.2011 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 7
31.05.2011 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
30.05.2011 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 7
30.05.2011 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
26.05.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.05.2011 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
18.05.2011 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 6
18.03.2011 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
18.03.2011 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
18.03.2011 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
18.03.2011 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
18.03.2011 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
18.03.2011 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
11.03.2011 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 2
17.02.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
17.02.2011 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
17.02.2011 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
15.02.2011 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 1
15.02.2011 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
01.02.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
31.01.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
27.01.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
26.01.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
25.01.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
18.01.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
18.01.2011 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
18.01.2011 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
18.01.2011 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
14.01.2011 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 6
11.01.2011 Annex Opposition 3
11.01.2011 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
09.11.2010 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
09.11.2010 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
09.11.2010 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
08.11.2010 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
08.11.2010 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
05.11.2010 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
04.11.2010 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 34
15.06.2010 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 8
02.06.2010 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
01.06.2010 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
31.05.2010 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 1
25.05.2010 Claims Appeal 3
25.05.2010 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
25.05.2010 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
25.05.2010 Non-scannable object Appeal 1
19.05.2010 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
10.05.2010 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
07.05.2010 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 2
16.04.2010 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
31.03.2010 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
31.03.2010 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
31.03.2010 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
30.03.2010 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 6
30.03.2010 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
23.03.2010 Change of composition of the board (except boards 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
28.10.2009 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
03.08.2007 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
03.08.2007 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
01.08.2007 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 8
30.07.2007 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 8
27.06.2007 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
15.06.2007 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 11
19.03.2007 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 2
09.03.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
09.03.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
09.03.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
09.03.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
09.03.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
09.03.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
09.03.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
09.03.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
09.03.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
09.03.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
09.03.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
09.03.2007 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
09.03.2007 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 12
05.03.2007 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 2
26.02.2007 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
14.02.2007 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
08.02.2007 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 3
06.02.2007 Processing of an appeal Appeal 1
12.01.2007 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
24.11.2006 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
21.11.2006 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
21.11.2006 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
21.11.2006 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
15.11.2006 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
15.11.2006 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
09.11.2006 Annex Opposition 8
09.11.2006 Annex Opposition 8
09.11.2006 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 8
09.11.2006 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
09.11.2006 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 16
09.11.2006 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
09.11.2006 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
09.11.2006 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
09.11.2006 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
09.11.2006 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
13.10.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
13.10.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
13.10.2006 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Opposition 1
06.10.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.10.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.10.2006 Request for transfer of rights Opposition 6
29.09.2006 Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights Opposition 4
29.09.2006 Request for transfer of rights Opposition 1
28.09.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.09.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.09.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.09.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
15.09.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
15.09.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
15.09.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.09.2006 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 5
09.09.2006 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 9
09.09.2006 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
09.09.2006 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
08.09.2006 Fax dealing with oral proceedings during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
08.09.2006 Fax dealing with oral proceedings during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
07.09.2006 Fax dealing with oral proceedings during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
07.09.2006 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 8
07.09.2006 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
07.09.2006 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
07.09.2006 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
07.09.2006 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
05.09.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.09.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.09.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.09.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.08.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.08.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.08.2006 Fax dealing with oral proceedings during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
24.08.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.08.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.08.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.08.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.08.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.08.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.08.2006 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 1
23.08.2006 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
21.08.2006 Fax dealing with oral proceedings during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
18.07.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
18.07.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.07.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.07.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.07.2006 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 2
07.07.2006 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
07.07.2006 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
30.06.2006 Fax dealing with oral proceedings during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
15.06.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 14
15.06.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 20
15.06.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 14
15.06.2006 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 20
06.06.2006 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
19.05.2006 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
15.05.2006 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
12.05.2006 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
12.05.2006 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
10.05.2006 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
04.05.2006 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 7
04.05.2006 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
04.05.2006 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
04.05.2006 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
04.05.2006 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
18.04.2006 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
21.02.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.02.2006 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.01.2006 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 7
26.01.2006 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
26.01.2006 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
26.01.2006 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
26.01.2006 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
19.09.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.09.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.09.2005 Claims Opposition 3
09.09.2005 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
05.09.2005 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Opposition 1
25.08.2005 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
18.08.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
18.08.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.05.2005 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 14
18.03.2005 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
15.03.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
15.03.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
15.03.2005 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
04.03.2005 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
03.12.2004 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.12.2004 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
03.12.2004 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
15.11.2004 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
10.09.2004 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
10.09.2004 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
10.09.2004 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
23.07.2004 Authorisation of representative Opposition 2
23.07.2004 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
27.05.2004 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
24.05.2004 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
14.05.2004 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 2
14.05.2004 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 16
14.05.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Opposition 12
14.05.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Opposition 3
14.05.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Opposition 18
14.05.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Opposition 3
14.05.2004 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Opposition 14
14.05.2004 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Opposition 9
14.05.2004 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Opposition 9
14.05.2004 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Opposition 18
14.05.2004 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Opposition 13
14.05.2004 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Opposition 14
14.05.2004 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Opposition 22
14.05.2004 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Opposition 44
14.05.2004 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Opposition 16
14.05.2004 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Opposition 8
13.05.2004 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 6
13.05.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
13.05.2004 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
13.05.2004 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
13.05.2004 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
13.05.2004 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 24
13.05.2004 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 24
13.05.2004 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 32
13.05.2004 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 44
12.05.2004 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 18
12.05.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
12.05.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
27.08.2003 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
19.08.2003 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
19.08.2003 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
03.07.2003 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
12.05.2003 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
30.04.2003 Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights Search / examination 5
30.04.2003 Request for transfer of rights Search / examination 1
05.03.2003 Indication of deficiencies in a request for registering a transfer of rights and invitation to correct them Search / examination 2
07.02.2003 Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights Search / examination 2
07.02.2003 Request for transfer of rights Search / examination 1
27.01.2003 Indication of deficiencies in a request for registering a transfer of rights and invitation to correct them Search / examination 2
13.12.2002 Request for transfer of rights Search / examination 1
11.12.2002 Request for transfer of rights Search / examination 1
20.11.2002 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
20.11.2002 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
20.11.2002 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
20.11.2002 Translation of the claims Search / examination 4
18.10.2002 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
18.10.2002 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
18.10.2002 Text intended for grant Search / examination 15
27.09.2002 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
08.12.2000 Claims Search / examination 3
08.12.2000 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
05.12.2000 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
04.08.2000 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
04.08.2000 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
05.12.1998 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 3
01.12.1998 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
04.11.1998 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
04.11.1998 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
02.11.1998 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
02.11.1998 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 2
29.10.1998 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 6
19.10.1998 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
30.09.1998 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
30.09.1998 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
28.10.1997 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
25.09.1997 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 8
25.09.1997 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 20
25.09.1997 Priority document Search / examination 12
25.09.1997 Priority document Search / examination 18