Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0885552

EP0885552 - ELECTRICAL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.12.2000
Database last updated on 22.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.06.2002Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 07.08.2002  [2002/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ROBERT BOSCH GMBH
Postfach 30 02 20
70442 Stuttgart / DE
[1998/52]
Inventor(s)01 / BENTZ, Willy
Alte Grosssachsenheimer Strasse 3
D-74343 Sachsenheim / DE
02 / DEPTULA, Piotr
Firstwaldstrasse 15
D-72116 Mössingen / DE
03 / ERNST, Waldemar
Ziegelgartenstrasse 23
D-71665 Vaihingen / DE
[1998/52]
Application number, filing date96946006.222.11.1996
[1998/52]
WO1996DE02240
Priority number, dateDE199610924309.03.1996         Original published format: DE 19609243
[1998/52]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9733459
Date:12.09.1997
Language:DE
[1997/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0885552
Date:23.12.1998
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.1997
[1998/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0885552
Date:09.02.2000
Language:DE
[2000/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.09.1997
ClassificationInternational:H05K7/20
[1998/52]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1998/52]
TitleGerman:ELEKTRISCHES GERÄT[1998/52]
English:ELECTRICAL DEVICE[1998/52]
French:DISPOSITIF ELECTRIQUE[1998/52]
Entry into regional phase09.10.1998National basic fee paid 
09.10.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
09.10.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.09.1997Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
09.10.1998Examination requested  [1998/52]
24.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
08.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.10.1999Fee for grant paid
18.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.11.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
30.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR09.02.2000
[2002/32]
Cited inInternational search[Y]DE9015130U  (MARELLI AUTRONICA SPA) [Y] 1,3,4,6 * figure 5 *;
 [Y]DE3545253  (PHILIPS PATENTVERWALTUNG [DE]) [Y] 1,3,4,6 * column 2, line 53 - line 64; figure 2 *;
 [A]DE3416348  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 6,7;
 [AD]DE4222838  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]);
 [A]US5225965  (BAILEY TERRY G [US], et al)
 [A]  - FISHER T S ET AL, "ADHESIVELESS HEATSINK ASSEMBLY FOR VERTICAL POWER DEVICES", MOTOROLA TECHNICAL DEVELOPMENTS, (19930301), vol. 18, pages 42 - 43, XP000349553 [A] 5 * figure II *