Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0784359

EP0784359 - Electrical connector with terminal modules and terminal tail aligning device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.09.2001
Database last updated on 15.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip07.09.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 24.10.2001 [2001/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MOLEX INCORPORATED
2222 Wellington Court Lisle
Illinois 60532-1682 / US
[N/P]
Former [1997/29]For all designated states
MOLEX INCORPORATED
2222 Wellington Court
Lisle Illinois 60532-1682 / US
Inventor(s)01 / McFarlane, Walter G.
2415 College Green Drive
Elgin, Illinois 60123 / US
02 / Harwath, Frank A.
1151 Robey Avenue
Downers Grove, Illinois 60516 / US
[1997/29]
Representative(s)Blumbach · Zinngrebe Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
PatentConsult
Alexandrastraße 5
65187 Wiesbaden / DE
[N/P]
Former [1997/29]Blumbach, Kramer & Partner
Patentanwälte, Sonnenberger Strasse 100
65193 Wiesbaden / DE
Application number, filing date97100081.504.01.1997
[1997/29]
Priority number, dateUS1996058463611.01.1996         Original published format: US 584636
[1997/29]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0784359
Date:16.07.1997
Language:EN
[1997/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0784359
Date:02.11.2000
Language:EN
[2000/44]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.04.1997
ClassificationInternational:H01R12/18, H01R12/20
[2000/33]
Former International [1997/29]H01R23/70
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1997/29]
TitleGerman:Elektrischer Verbinder mit Anschlussmodulen und Ausrichtungsvorrichtung für Anschlussenden[1997/29]
English:Electrical connector with terminal modules and terminal tail aligning device[1997/29]
French:Connecteur électrique avec modules de connexion et un dispositif d'alignement des extrémités des bornes[1997/29]
Examination procedure29.12.1997Examination requested  [1998/10]
05.01.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
08.05.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.08.2000Fee for grant paid
08.08.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.08.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.01.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
27.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0635912  (MOLEX INC [US]) [A] 1,12,13 * column 4, line 25 - line 40 * * column 7, line 9 - line 17; figure 2 *;
 [A]EP0546884  (SOURIAU & CIE [FR]) [A] 1,6,12 * column 4, line 1 - line 23; figures 1,2 *