blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0784366 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0784366



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 394
27.02.2001 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
16.03.2000 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
28.02.2000 Approval of request for amendments Search / examination 1
17.02.2000 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
17.02.2000 Translation of the claims Search / examination 11
17.02.2000 Translation of the claims Search / examination 11
01.02.2000 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 Search / examination 1
16.11.1999 Approval of request for amendments Search / examination 1
16.11.1999 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
10.11.1999 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 3
03.11.1999 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 Search / examination 1
29.10.1999 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
06.10.1999 Grant of extension of time limit Search / examination 1
27.09.1999 Request for extension of time limit to announcement of intention to grant Search / examination 1
18.08.1999 Text intended for grant Search / examination 82
18.05.1999 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
01.04.1999 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
30.09.1997 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
30.09.1997 European search report Search / examination 2
06.05.1997 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
06.05.1997 Priority document Search / examination 36
06.05.1997 Priority document Search / examination 40
06.05.1997 Translation of priority document Search / examination 57
06.05.1997 Translation of priority document Search / examination 44
09.01.1997 Abstract Search / examination 2
09.01.1997 Claims Search / examination 14
09.01.1997 Description Search / examination 52
09.01.1997 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
09.01.1997 Drawings Search / examination 15
09.01.1997 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6