blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0784366


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
23.02.2001 No opposition filed within time limit published on  11.04.2001 [2001/15]
10.03.2000 (Expected) grant published on  26.04.2000 [2000/17]
10.03.2000 Change - classification published on  26.04.2000 [2000/17]
10.03.2000 Change - classification published on  26.04.2000 [2000/17]
29.02.2000 Communication of intention to grant a patent
08.02.2000 Renewal fee
12.11.1999 Change - German title published on  29.12.1999 [1999/52]
05.11.1999 Communication of intention to grant
05.11.1999 Communication of intention to grant a patent
13.05.1999 First examination report
11.05.1999 Communication of intention to grant
09.04.1999 Change - French title published on  26.05.1999 [1999/21]
05.02.1999 Renewal fee
17.04.1998 Request for examination filed published on  03.06.1998 [1998/23]
03.10.1997 Publication of search report published on  19.11.1997 [1997/47]
26.09.1997 Change - classification published on  12.11.1997 [1997/46]
26.09.1997 Change - classification published on  12.11.1997 [1997/46]
30.05.1997 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  16.07.1997 [1997/29]