Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0784366

EP0784366 - Optical semiconductor apparatus, fabrication method thereof, modulation method therefor, light source apparatus and optical communication system or method using the same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.02.2001
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.02.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 11.04.2001 [2001/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [1997/29]For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Mizutani, Natsuhiko
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
02 / Miyazawa, Seiichi
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP
[1997/29]
Representative(s)Tiedtke, Harro
Patentanwaltsbüro
Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner
Bavariaring 4
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1997/29]Tiedtke, Harro, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date97100259.709.01.1997
[1997/29]
Priority number, dateJP1996002052811.01.1996         Original published format: JP 2052896
JP1996020933219.07.1996         Original published format: JP 20933296
[1997/29]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0784366
Date:16.07.1997
Language:EN
[1997/29]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0784366
Date:19.11.1997
[1997/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0784366
Date:26.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.09.1997
ClassificationInternational:H01S5/06, H01S5/32, H04B10/14
[2000/17]
Former International [1997/46]H01S3/103, H01S3/19, H04B10/14
Former International [1997/29]H01S3/19, H01S3/103, H04B10/14
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1997/29]
TitleGerman:Optische Halbleitervorrichtung, Herstellungsverfahren, Modulationsverfahren, Lichtquelle und optisches Kommunikationssystem oder Verfahren zu deren Herstellung[1999/52]
English:Optical semiconductor apparatus, fabrication method thereof, modulation method therefor, light source apparatus and optical communication system or method using the same[1997/29]
French:Appareil semi-conducteur optique, sa méthode de fabrication, méthode de modulation pour celui-ci, source de lumière et système de communication optique ou méthode utilisant celui-ci[1999/21]
Former [1997/29]Optischer Halbleitervorrichtung, Herstellungsverfahren, Modulationsverfahren, Lichtquelle und optisches Kommunikationssystem
Former [1997/29]Appareil semi-conducteur optique, méthode de fabrication, méthode de modulation, source de lumière et système de communication optique
Examination procedure06.04.1998Examination requested  [1998/23]
18.05.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
10.11.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.02.2000Fee for grant paid
17.02.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.01.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
27.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0674372  (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1-5,7,12-16,29,31,47-49 * column 5, line 22 - column 9, line 44; figures 2-6,8,9 *;
 [A]EP0668641  (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1-6,8,29-31,47-49 * column 1 - column 16; figures 1-15 *;
 [A]US5117469  (CHEUNG KWOK-WAI [US], et al) [A] 1-7,12-14 * column 8 - column 9; figure 11 *;
 [DA]EP0361035  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [DA] 1,47-49 * the whole document *