Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0788982

EP0788982 - Actuator button for aerosol containers or the like [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.02.2001
Database last updated on 17.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip04.06.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 21.07.2004  [2004/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Takahashi Plastic Industry Co., Ltd.
17-13, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku
Osaka / JP
[N/P]
Former [1997/33]For all designated states
Takahashi Plastic Industry Co., Ltd.
17-13, Nagaike-cho
Abeno-ku, Osaka / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Takahashi, Toshimi
4-45-6, Nakata
Yao-City, Osaka / JP
[1997/33]
Representative(s)Müller, Frithjof E. , et al
Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17
81667 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/15]Müller, Frithjof E., Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte MÜLLER & HOFFMANN, Innere Wiener Strasse 17
81667 München / DE
Former [1997/33]Müller, Frithjof E., Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwälte MÜLLER & HOFFMANN, Innere Wiener Strasse 17
81667 München / DE
Application number, filing date97101359.429.01.1997
[1997/33]
Priority number, dateJP1996005817508.02.1996         Original published format: JP 5817596
JP1996006364913.02.1996         Original published format: JP 6364996
[1997/33]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0788982
Date:13.08.1997
Language:EN
[1997/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0788982
Date:12.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.05.1997
ClassificationInternational:B65D83/16
[1997/33]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1997/33]
TitleGerman:Druckknopf für Aerosolbehälter oder dergleichen[1997/33]
English:Actuator button for aerosol containers or the like[1997/33]
French:Bouton-poussoir pour récipients aérosols ou analogue[1997/33]
Examination procedure18.08.1997Examination requested  [1997/42]
16.06.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.10.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.02.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.05.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.06.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
06.09.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.12.1999Fee for grant paid
03.12.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.01.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
26.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR12.04.2000
[2004/30]
Documents cited:Search[YA]GB2049063  (ADM SPA) [Y] 1 * page 1, line 28 - line 60; figures 1-3 * [A] 13;
 [YA]GB1359152  (METAL BOX CO LTD) [Y] 1 * page 4, lines 75-130; figures 1-18 * [A] 3,5,6,15;
 [A]AT348917B  (WIT ERIK DE [AT]) [A] 1 * page 2, lines 47-51; figures 1-5 *;
 [A]US3729119  (SETTE J, et al) [A] 10,12 * figures 11-13 *;
 [A]DE8519968U  (AEROSOL INVETIONS AND DEVELOPMENT S.A.);
 [A]DE2341417  (GRAW JOSEF DIPL-PHYS DR)