Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0858847

EP0858847 - Thin sheet forming dies [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.10.2002
Database last updated on 13.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip11.10.2002No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 27.11.2002  [2002/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
UMIX Co., Ltd.
8-1, Shinke 1-chome Neyagawa-shi
Osaka 572-0812 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1998/34]For all designated states
Umix Co., Ltd.
8-1, Shinke 1-chome
Neyagawa-shi, Osaka 572-0812 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Matsuoka, Mitsuo
25-3, Korigaoka 8-chome
Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573 / JP
[1998/34]
Representative(s)Henkel, Breuer & Partner
Patentanwälte
Maximiliansplatz 21
80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/34]Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel
Möhlstrasse 37
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date97101919.506.02.1997
[1998/34]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0858847
Date:19.08.1998
Language:EN
[1998/34]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0858847
Date:05.12.2001
Language:EN
[2001/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.08.1997
ClassificationInternational:B21D22/02
[1998/34]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [1998/34]
TitleGerman:Formgesenk von dünnen Blech[1998/34]
English:Thin sheet forming dies[1998/34]
French:Matrice de formage de tôle mince[1998/34]
Examination procedure15.02.1999Examination requested  [1999/15]
24.03.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.05.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.03.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
05.06.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.08.2001Fee for grant paid
16.08.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.09.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
28.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
26.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[A]US5347838  (MATSUOKA MITSUO [JP]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0427886  (UEMURA METAL IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]JPH08276218  ;
 [A]JPH081242  ;
 [A]JPH06210359  ;
 [A]JPS59197318
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970228), vol. 097, no. 002, [A] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960531), vol. 096, no. 005, [A] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19941102), vol. 018, no. 572, Database accession no. (M - 1696), [A] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850320), vol. 009, no. 063, Database accession no. (M - 365), [A] 1 * abstract *
by applicantJPS6341662B