blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0777038 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0777038



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 192
06.02.2001 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
24.02.2000 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
24.09.1999 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
24.09.1999 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
24.09.1999 Translation of the claims Search / examination 5
13.07.1999 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
13.07.1999 Translation of priority document Search / examination 39
30.06.1999 Filing of a translation of the previous application Search / examination 1
30.06.1999 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 3
20.05.1999 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
04.03.1999 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
04.03.1999 Text intended for grant Search / examination 44
11.02.1999 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
01.12.1998 Claims Search / examination 4
01.12.1998 Description Search / examination 10
01.12.1998 Description Search / examination 8
01.12.1998 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
31.08.1998 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
30.01.1998 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
17.06.1997 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
17.06.1997 European search report Search / examination 3
08.02.1997 Abstract Search / examination 1
08.02.1997 Claims Search / examination 3
08.02.1997 Description Search / examination 24
08.02.1997 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
08.02.1997 Drawings Search / examination 15
08.02.1997 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 4
08.02.1997 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6