Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0777038

EP0777038 - A method of operating a valve control system of an internal combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1997/23]Control system for internal combustion engines
[1999/12]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.02.2001
Database last updated on 20.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.02.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 21.03.2001 [2001/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [1997/23]For all designated states
HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome
Minato-ku Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Sono, Hiroshi, c/o Honda R & D Co., Ltd.
No. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome
Wako-shi, Saitama-ken / JP
02 / Ogawa, Ken, c/o Honda R & D Co., Ltd.
No. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome
Wako-shi, Saitama-ken / JP
[1997/23]
Representative(s)Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Gropiusplatz 10
70563 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [1997/23]KOHLER SCHMID + PARTNER
Patentanwälte Ruppmannstrasse 27
70565 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date97102031.826.01.1996
[1997/23]
Priority number, dateJP1995003139427.01.1995         Original published format: JP 3139495
[1997/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0777038
Date:04.06.1997
Language:EN
[1997/23]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0777038
Date:06.08.1997
[1997/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0777038
Date:05.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.06.1997
ClassificationInternational:F01L9/04
[1997/23]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1997/23]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Steuerung eines Ventiltriebs einer Brennkraftmaschine[1999/12]
English:A method of operating a valve control system of an internal combustion engine[1999/12]
French:Procédé de fonctionnement d'un système de commande de soupapes d'un moteur à combustion interne[1999/12]
Former [1997/23]Steuervorrichtung für Brennkraftmaschinen
Former [1997/23]Control system for internal combustion engines
Former [1997/23]Système de commande pour moteurs à combustion interne
Examination procedure08.02.1997Examination requested  [1997/23]
31.08.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.12.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
30.06.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.09.1999Fee for grant paid
24.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP96101106.1  / EP0724067
Opposition(s)06.01.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.01.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
26.01.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
18.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0376714  (ISUZU MOTORS LTD [JP]) [X] 1,4 * column 3, line 57 - column 4, line 50 * * figure 1 *;
 [XA]WO9202712  (RICHARDS KEITH LESLIE [GB], et al) [X] 1 * page 8, line 15 - page 11, line 30 * * figures 1-3 * [A] 4;
 [A]US5190013  (DOZIER HENRY C [US]) [A] 1,4 * column 3, line 28 - line 46 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]DE3019109  (ITT IND GMBH DEUTSCHE [DE]) [A] 1,4 * page 3, line 6 - line 29 * * figure 1 *