Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0794580

EP0794580 - Piezoelectric transformer [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.04.2004
Database last updated on 22.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.04.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 02.06.2004  [2004/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MURATA MANUFACTURING CO., LTD.
26-10, Tenjin 2-chome Nagaokakyo-shi
Kyoto-fu 226 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1997/37]For all designated states
MURATA MANUFACTURING CO., LTD.
26-10, Tenjin 2-chome
Nagaokakyo-shi Kyoto-fu 226 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Ogiso, Koji
Murata Manufacturing Co. Ltd. 26-10,Tenjin 2-chome
Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto-fu / JP
02 / Ando, Akira
Murata Manufacturing Co. Ltd. 26-10,Tenjin 2-chome
Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto-fu / JP
[1997/37]
Representative(s)Gossel, Hans K. , et al
Lorenz Seidler Gossel
Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte
Partnerschaft mbB
Widenmayerstrasse 23
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1997/37]Gossel, Hans K., Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Lorenz-Seidler-Gossel Widenmayerstrasse 23
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date97102345.213.02.1997
[1997/37]
Priority number, dateJP1996002691914.02.1996         Original published format: JP 2691996
JP1996002692014.02.1996         Original published format: JP 2692096
[1997/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0794580
Date:10.09.1997
Language:EN
[1997/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0794580
Date:11.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/24]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.07.1997
ClassificationInternational:H01L41/107
[1997/37]
Designated contracting statesDE,   NL [1997/37]
TitleGerman:Piezoelektrischer Transformator[1997/37]
English:Piezoelectric transformer[1997/37]
French:Transformateur piézo-électrique[1997/37]
Examination procedure08.10.1997Examination requested  [1997/49]
12.11.1997Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.03.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
31.08.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.04.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.08.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.01.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.02.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.12.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.04.2003Fee for grant paid
14.04.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.02.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
29.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
26.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
28.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
27.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[X]JPH07176805  ;
 [X]JPH0832137  ;
 [X]JPH05110368  ;
 [X]US5440195  (OHNISHI OSAMU [JP], et al) [X] 1 * abstract *;
 [PA]EP0720246  (MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL IND [JP]) [PA] 1-12 * the whole document *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951130), vol. 095, no. 010, [X] 1 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960628), vol. 096, no. 006, [X] 1 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930825), vol. 017, no. 466, Database accession no. (E - 1421), [X] 1 * abstract *