Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0811785

EP0811785 - Hydraulically-damped bushing [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.08.2002
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2002No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 09.10.2002  [2002/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Carl Freudenberg KG
Höhnerweg 2-4
69469 Weinheim / DE
[2002/04]
Former [1997/50]For all designated states
Firma Carl Freudenberg
Höhnerweg 2-4
69469 Weinheim / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Rudolf, Hans-Joachim
Am Tannenweg 14
26935 Stadland / DE
02 / Simuttis, Arnold, Dr.
Pfingstwiese 3
55545 Bad-Kreuznach / DE
03 / Rudolph, Axel
Finkenweg 23
64625 Bensheim / DE
[1997/50]
Application number, filing date97102613.319.02.1997
[1997/50]
Priority number, dateDE199612224804.06.1996         Original published format: DE 19622248
[1997/50]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0811785
Date:10.12.1997
Language:DE
[1997/50]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0811785
Date:05.01.2000
[2000/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0811785
Date:17.10.2001
Language:DE
[2001/42]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:F16F13/14
[1997/50]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1997/50]
TitleGerman:Hydraulisch dämpfende Hülsengummifeder[1997/50]
English:Hydraulically-damped bushing[1997/50]
French:Manchon à amortissement hydraulique[1997/50]
Examination procedure17.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/09]
16.03.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
11.04.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.06.2001Fee for grant paid
22.06.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)18.07.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.02.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
04.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
02.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[YA]US4884789  (TAKEDA MASARU ET AL) [Y] 1 * figure 1 * * column 3, line 51 - line 65 * [A] 4,14;
 [YA]DE4242080  (FREUDENBERG CARL FA) [Y] 1 * figure 5 * [A] 2,3;
 [A]EP0411997  (HUTCHINSON) [A] 1,14 * column 6, line 1 - line 13 * * claims 5,6 *;
 [A]GB2291691  (AVON CLEVITE LTD) [A] 7-11,14 * figure 1 *;
 [A]JPS6465344  ;
 [A]JPH07317832
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890619), vol. 013, no. 265, Database accession no. (M - 839), & JP01065344 A 19890310 (BRIDGESTONE CORP;OTHERS: 01) [A] * abstract *
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1996, no. 07, Database accession no. 1996-061156, XP002122168 & JPH07317832 A 19951208 (NISSAN MOTOR CO LTD) [A] * abstract *