Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0791364

EP0791364 - Composition based on acyclic perfume agents [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  19.01.2001
Database last updated on 15.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.01.2001Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 07.03.2001 [2001/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Schlaitzer Landwirtschaftliche Tierzucht GmbH
Am Morgengrund
06774 Schlaitz / DE
For all designated states
Stephan, Ursula, Prof. Dr.
Heidehäuser 6
06120 Halle/S. / DE
For all designated states
Strobel, Ute, Dr.
Eisenacher Strasse 12
04155 Leipzig / DE
For all designated states
Kochmann, Werner, Prof. Dr.
Krüllsstrasse 4b
06766 Wolfen / DE
[1997/35]
Inventor(s)01 / Rösch, Werner, Dipl.-Landwirt
Siedlung Nr. 7
06774 Schlaitz / DE
02 / Stephan, Ursula, Prof. Dr.
Heidehäuser 6
06120 Halle/S / DE
03 / Strobel, Ute, Dr.
Eisenacher Strasse 12
04155 Leipzig / DE
04 / Kochmann, Werner, Prof. Dr.
Krüllsstrasse 4b
06766 Wolfen / DE
[1997/35]
Representative(s)Tragsdorf, Bodo
Patentanwalt
Heinrich-Heine-Strasse 3
06844 Dessau / DE
[N/P]
Former [1997/35]Tragsdorf, Bodo, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwalt Heinrich-Heine-Str. 3
06844 Dessau / DE
Application number, filing date97102743.820.02.1997
[1997/35]
Priority number, dateDE1996203379U24.02.1996         Original published format: DE 29603379 U
[1997/35]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0791364
Date:27.08.1997
Language:DE
[1997/35]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0791364
Date:19.01.2000
[2000/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:A61L9/01
[1997/35]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [1997/35]
TitleGerman:Gemisch auf der Basis acyclischer Riechstoffe[1997/35]
English:Composition based on acyclic perfume agents[1997/35]
French:Composition à base d'agents parfumants acycliques[1997/35]
Examination procedure20.07.2000Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2001/10]
05.10.2000Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2001/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.02.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
15.09.2000M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
29.02.200004   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0247946  (ROBERTET SA [FR]) [A] 1,5 * column 1, line 1 - line 27 *;
 [D]WO8707152  (ROBERTET SA [FR]);
 [A]US4840792  (JOULAIN DANIEL [FR], et al) [A] 1,5 * column 1, line 1 - line 25 *;
 [A]US4226892  (KOVATS ERVIN, et al) [A] 1,5 * column 1, line 39 - line 47 * * example 44 *;
 [A]FR2666510  (LABO WUEST SA [FR]) [A] 1 * page 3, line 26 - page 4, line 2 *