Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0797021

EP0797021 - Modified steel anchoring insert for plastic airspring pistons [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.11.2001
Database last updated on 20.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip16.11.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 02.01.2002  [2002/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company
1144 East Market Street
Akron, OH 44316-0001 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/01]For all designated states
THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY
1144 East Market Street
Akron, Ohio 44316-0001 / US
Former [1997/39]For all designated states
THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY
1144 East Market Street
Akron, Ohio 44316-0001 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Adams, Anthony Dennis
679 Hampshire Road
Fairlawn, OH 44333 / US
[1997/39]
Representative(s)Leitz, Paul
Goodyear Technical Center, Patent Department, Avenue Gordon Smith
7750 Colmar-Berg / LU
[1997/39]
Application number, filing date97103008.521.02.1997
[1997/39]
Priority number, dateUS1996060959101.03.1996         Original published format: US 609591
[1997/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0797021
Date:24.09.1997
Language:EN
[1997/39]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0797021
Date:14.01.1998
[1998/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0797021
Date:03.01.2001
Language:EN
[2001/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.11.1997
ClassificationInternational:F16F9/04
[1997/39]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   IT [1997/39]
Extension statesSI21.02.1997
TitleGerman:Modifiziertes Verankerungseinsatzventil für Gasfederkolben[1997/39]
English:Modified steel anchoring insert for plastic airspring pistons[1997/39]
French:Insertion modifiée d'ancrage pour pistons plastiques de ressort pneumatique[1997/39]
Examination procedure21.02.1997Examination requested  [1997/39]
31.01.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
19.05.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.08.2000Fee for grant paid
02.08.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.10.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2002/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.02.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
10.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0546385  (CONTINENTAL AG [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]FR2523679  (SUMITOMO METAL IND [JP]) [A] 1 * figure 1 *;
 [A]EP0123171  (FIRESTONE TIRE & RUBBER CO [US]) [A] 1 * figure - *;
 [A]EP0647795  (PSA SIST ANTIVIBRANTI SPA [IT]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]FR1365203  (A.DIETZ);
 [A]GB2116667  (DUNLOP LTD)