Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0798122

EP0798122 - Printing apparatus comprising plural printer units [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.04.2002
Database last updated on 11.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip05.04.2002No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 22.05.2002  [2002/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Seiko Epson Corporation
4-1, Nishi-shinjuku 2-chome, Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo 163 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1997/40]For all designated states
SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION
4-1, Nishi-shinjuku 2-chome, Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo 163 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Endo, Katsujuki
c/o Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome
Suwa-shi, Nagano-ken, 392 / JP
[1997/40]
Representative(s)MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1997/40]Hoffmann, Eckart, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwalt, Bahnhofstrasse 103
82166 Gräfelfing / DE
Application number, filing date97103251.127.02.1997
[1997/40]
Priority number, dateJP1996004358929.02.1996         Original published format: JP 4358996
[1997/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0798122
Date:01.10.1997
Language:EN
[1997/40]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0798122
Date:08.07.1998
[1998/28]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0798122
Date:30.05.2001
Language:EN
[2001/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.05.1998
ClassificationInternational:B41J3/42, B41J3/54, G07G5/00, B41J29/02, B41J29/13
[1998/26]
Former International [1997/40]B41J3/42
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1997/40]
TitleGerman:Druckgerät mit mehreren Druckeinrichtungen[1997/40]
English:Printing apparatus comprising plural printer units[1997/40]
French:Appareil à imprimer comprenant plusiers unités d'impression[1997/40]
Examination procedure05.01.1999Examination requested  [1999/10]
30.06.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
08.11.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.02.2001Fee for grant paid
08.02.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)01.03.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.02.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
24.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
26.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0359580  (NCR CO [US]) [A] 1,14 * column 3, line 8 - column 4, line 5; figures 3-6 *;
 [A]EP0392643  (TOKYO ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,2,11,14,15 * column 2, line 49 - column 3, line 25; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]EP0195949  (NIXDORF COMPUTER AG [DE]) [A] 1-3,14-16 * page 7, line 9 - page 8, line 15; figure 1 *;
 [A]JPH05124278  ;
 [A]US4951564  (WILSON HILLIS L [US], et al) [A] 1,2,14,15 * column 3, line 43 - column 4, line 32; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US4587532  (ASANO JUNICHI [JP]) [A] 1,14 * column 1, line 28 - line 61; figures 1-4 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930907), vol. 17, no. 493, Database accession no. (M - 1475), [A] 1,2,14,15 * abstract *