Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0803986

EP0803986 - Liquid cooling system for high power solid state am transmitter [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.11.2000
Database last updated on 22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 27.12.2000 [2000/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HARRIS CORPORATION
1025 West NASA Blvd MS 53
Melbourne, FL 32919 / US
[1997/44]
Inventor(s)01 / Davis, Alan Merle
334 South 16th Street
Quincy, Illinois 62301 / US
02 / Blickman, Joseph David
RR2, Box 134
Quincy, Illinois 62301 / US
[1997/44]
Representative(s)Liesegang, Roland , et al
Boehmert & Boehmert
Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Pettenkoferstrasse 22
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1997/44]Liesegang, Roland, Dr.-Ing. , et al
FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38
80801 München / DE
Application number, filing date97103631.405.03.1997
[1997/44]
Priority number, dateUS1996062934308.04.1996         Original published format: US 629343
[1997/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0803986
Date:29.10.1997
Language:EN
[1997/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0803986
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.07.1997
ClassificationInternational:H04B1/036, H05K7/20
[1997/44]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   LI [1997/44]
TitleGerman:Flüssigkeitskühlsystem für AM-Hochleistungshalbleitersender[1997/44]
English:Liquid cooling system for high power solid state am transmitter[1997/44]
French:Système de refroidissement par liquide pour émetteur RF-MA de forte puissante[1997/44]
Examination procedure04.03.1998Examination requested  [1998/18]
07.04.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.08.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.09.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.01.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.04.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
07.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.09.1999Fee for grant paid
29.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.02.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0281404  (NEC CORP [JP]) [X] 1-4 * column 3, line 17 - column 4, line 23; figures 5-7 *;
 [X]US5345107  (DAIKOKU TAKAHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1-4 * column 8, lines 4-31; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]DE4401609  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1,5 * figures 2-4; claims 4,5 *;
 [A]EP0316129  (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-4 * abstract *;
 [A]US4037270  (AHMANN GERALD L, et al) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *