Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0786262

EP0786262 - Connecting needle for use with a blood treatment device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.04.2001
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip11.01.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 13.02.2008  [2008/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Müller, Hans
Reichenhaller Strasse 49
81547 München / DE
[1997/31]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1997/31]
Representative(s)Fleuchaus, Leo , et al
Fleuchaus & Gallo Melchiorstrasse 42
81479 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1997/31]Fleuchaus, Leo, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Melchiorstrasse 42
81479 München / DE
Application number, filing date97103776.715.02.1996
[1997/31]
Priority number, dateDE199510616322.02.1995         Original published format: DE 19506163
[1997/31]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0786262
Date:30.07.1997
Language:DE
[1997/31]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0786262
Date:07.06.2000
Language:DE
[2000/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.06.1997
ClassificationInternational:A61M1/32, A61M1/36
[1997/31]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT [1997/31]
TitleGerman:Steckspitze zur Verwendung in einer Vorrichtung zur Behandlung von Blut[1997/31]
English:Connecting needle for use with a blood treatment device[1997/31]
French:Aiguille de connection pour l'utilisation avec un dispositif de traitement du sang[1997/31]
Examination procedure10.07.1997Examination requested  [1997/37]
04.06.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
14.12.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.03.2000Fee for grant paid
14.03.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP96102297.7  / EP0728490
Opposition(s)08.03.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2001/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.02.1998Renewal fee patent year 03
26.02.1999Renewal fee patent year 04
28.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipES07.06.2000
FR07.06.2000
GB07.06.2000
IT07.06.2000
NL07.06.2000
DK07.09.2000
PT07.09.2000
IE05.02.2001
LU15.02.2001
BE28.02.2001
[2008/07]
Former [2006/14]ES07.06.2000
FR07.06.2000
GB07.06.2000
NL07.06.2000
DK07.09.2000
PT07.09.2000
IE05.02.2001
LU15.02.2001
BE28.02.2001
Former [2004/39]ES07.06.2000
GB07.06.2000
NL07.06.2000
DK07.09.2000
PT07.09.2000
FR03.11.2000
IE05.02.2001
LU15.02.2001
BE28.02.2001
Former [2003/46]ES07.06.2000
GB07.06.2000
NL07.06.2000
DK07.09.2000
PT07.09.2000
FR03.11.2000
IE05.02.2001
BE28.02.2001
Former [2003/09]ES07.06.2000
GB07.06.2000
NL07.06.2000
PT07.09.2000
FR03.11.2000
IE05.02.2001
BE28.02.2001
Former [2002/27]ES07.06.2000
GB07.06.2000
PT07.09.2000
FR03.11.2000
IE05.02.2001
BE28.02.2001
Former [2002/12]GB07.06.2000
PT07.09.2000
FR03.11.2000
IE05.02.2001
BE28.02.2001
Former [2002/10]GB07.06.2000
PT07.09.2000
FR03.11.2000
IE05.02.2001
Former [2001/50]GB07.06.2000
IE07.06.2000
PT07.09.2000
FR03.11.2000
Former [2001/24]GB07.06.2000
PT07.09.2000
FR03.11.2000
Former [2001/17]GB07.06.2000
PT07.09.2000
Former [2001/16]PT07.09.2000
Documents cited:Search[A]US3325641  (G. W. JONES) [A] 1 * column 1, line 54 - column 3, line 21; figure - *;
 [A]DE8901513U  (HÜBNER, KARL-ALEXANDER) [A] 1 * page 8, line 1 - page 9, line 2; figures 1-3 * * page 10, line 1 - page 12, line 26 *;
 [ADP]DE4410411  (MUELLER HANS) [ADP] 1 * abstract * * column 4, line 1 - line 67 *;
 [A]US2887107  (F. WEHRLI);
 [A]SE8504062
 [A]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 87, no. 16, Database accession no. 87-114052, XP002017588 & SE8504062 A 19870303 (GAMBRO CARDIO AB) [A] * abstract *