Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0802007

EP0802007 - Traction head for metal bar cropping benches [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.04.2004
Database last updated on 18.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip17.02.2006Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FR
published on 05.04.2006  [2006/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Schnell S.p.A.
Via Avogadro 9, Zona Industriale di Rosciano
61032 Fano (Pesaro) / IT
[2003/17]
Former [1998/50]For all designated states
Schnell S.p.A.
Via Avogadro, 9, Zona Industriale
61032 Fano (Pesaro) / IT
Former [1997/43]For all designated states
SCHNELL S.r.L.
Via Avogadro, 9, Zona Industriale di Rosciano
I-61032 Fano (Pesaro) / IT
Inventor(s)01 / Monti, Bernardino
Viale della Libertà 104
61039 San Costanzo (Pesaro) / IT
[1997/43]
Representative(s)Modiano, Guido , et al
Dr. Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16
20123 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [1997/43]Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing. , et al
Modiano & Associati S.r.l. Via Meravigli, 16
20123 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date97103847.607.03.1997
[1997/43]
Priority number, dateIT1996BO0020717.04.1996         Original published format: IT BO960207
[1997/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0802007
Date:22.10.1997
Language:EN
[1997/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0802007
Date:04.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.06.1997
ClassificationInternational:B23D33/00, B23D59/00, G01B5/04
[1997/43]
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   IT,   LI [1997/43]
TitleGerman:Antriebseinrichtung für eine Stabschneidvorrichtung[2002/43]
English:Traction head for metal bar cropping benches[1997/43]
French:Dispositif de traction pour un appareil de coupe de barres[1997/43]
Former [1997/43]Beschleunigungseinrichtung für eine Stabschneidvorrichtung
Examination procedure19.03.1998Examination requested  [1998/24]
22.12.1999Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.04.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.11.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
11.01.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.10.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.02.2003Fee for grant paid
18.02.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.03.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
22.02.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
21.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
22.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
26.03.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT04.06.2003
CH04.06.2003
FR04.06.2003
LI04.06.2003
[2006/14]
Former [2004/03]AT04.06.2003
CH04.06.2003
LI04.06.2003
Former [2004/01]CH04.06.2003
LI04.06.2003
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP0326001  (PEDDINGHAUS CORP [US]) [X] 1 * column 5, line 46 - column 20, line 54; figures 1-8 * [Y] 2,3,5;
 [Y]US4476754  (DUCRET LUCIEN C [US]) [Y] 2,3 * column 2, line 9 - column 6, line 15; figures 1-11 *;
 [Y]US5382098  (RIGAUX CHRISTIAN [FR], et al) [Y] 5 * column 1, line 6 - line 30 *